This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:27:55 (UTC).

MOREE v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 MOREE filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt, Doris L. Pryor, Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01892

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Tanya Walton Pratt

Richard L. Young

Referral Judges

Doris L. Pryor

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REBECCA MOREE

Defendants

COOK INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL LLC

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arati Chauhan Furness

Attorney at FEARS NACHAWATI, PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Matthew R. McCarley

Attorney at FEARS NACHAWATI, PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant Attorneys

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge Tanya Walton Pratt, Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor are no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:20-cv-01892-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (REO) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#12

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01890-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01892-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01901-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01903-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01911-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01913-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01920-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01921-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#11

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01890-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01892-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01901-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01903-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01911-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01913-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01920-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01921-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#9

(#6) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 8/6/2020.(LBT) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Arati Chauhan Furness on behalf of Plaintiff REBECCA MOREE. (Furness, Arati) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. McCarley on behalf of Plaintiff REBECCA MOREE. (McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, filed by REBECCA MOREE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6080300) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01890-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01892-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01901-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01903-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01911-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01913-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01920-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01921-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01890-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01892-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01901-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01903-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01911-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01913-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01920-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01921-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docket(#7) Remark - Pending Actions SD/IN 1:20-cv-01890-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01892-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01901-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01903-RLY-TAB Transferred as Member Actions to MDL 2570 on 8/6/2020. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01890-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01892-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01901-RLY-TAB, 1:20-cv-01903-RLY-TAB (LBT) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 8/6/2020.(LBT) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge Tanya Walton Pratt, Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor are no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:20-cv-01892-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (REO) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Arati Chauhan Furness on behalf of Plaintiff REBECCA MOREE. (Furness, Arati) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. McCarley on behalf of Plaintiff REBECCA MOREE. (McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, filed by REBECCA MOREE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6080300) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less