This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2021 at 08:16:06 (UTC).

Mordhorst Cleaning LLC v. Allstate Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 Mordhorst Cleaning LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel D. Domenico and S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02678

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Domenico

Referral Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mordhorst Cleaning LLC dba Blue Ribbon Exteriors and Construction

Mordhorst Cleaning LLC a Colorado limited liability company doing business as Blue Ribbon Exteriors and Construction

Defendant

Allstate Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathanael Thomas Archuleta

Attorney at Furtado Law PC

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Suite 755

Denver, CO 80209

Carl Joseph Snider

Attorney at Furtado Law PC

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Suite 755

Denver, CO 80209

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Summons

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/5/2021. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02678-DDD. (trvo, ) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mordhorst Cleaning LLC. Allstate Insurance Company served on 10/5/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. (Archuleta, Nathanael) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#9

(#9) Request for Clerk's Entry of Judgment as to Plaintiff's Complaint by Plaintiff Mordhorst Cleaning LLC. (Snider, Carl) Modified on 11/24/2021 to correct event and text (athom, ). (Entered: 11/24/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTE REGARDING DEFAULT Default. Clerk's Entry of Default will not be entered as to Allstate Insurance Company re #9 MOTION for Entry of Default as: the affidavit or declaration required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a) was not filed, by Clerk. Text Only Entry (athom, ) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk's Entry of Judgment as to Plaintiff's Complaint by Plaintiff Mordhorst Cleaning LLC. (Snider, Carl) Modified on 11/24/2021 to correct event and text (athom, ). (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET for 12/20/2021 11:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, no later than seven calendar days before the conference. At the scheduled time, counsel shall call the Court provided conference line at (888) 251-2909 Access Code: 5662814#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/16/2021. Text Only Entry (amont, ) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER Telephone Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews.The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, no later than seven calendar days before the conference. At the scheduled time, counsel shall call the Court provided conference line at (888) 251-2909 Access Code: 5662814#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/13/2021. Text Only Entry (amont, ) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mordhorst Cleaning LLC. Allstate Insurance Company served on 10/5/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. (Archuleta, Nathanael) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/5/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc4) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/5/2021. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02678-DDD. (trvo, ) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jcharl, ) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, ) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8103983)Attorney Nathanael Thomas Archuleta added to party Mordhorst Cleaning LLC dba Blue Ribbon Exteriors and Construction(pty:pla), filed by Mordhorst Cleaning LLC dba Blue Ribbon Exteriors and Construction. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Archuleta, Nathanael) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathanael Thomas Archuleta