Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2020 at 08:32:03 (UTC).

Gene Moran v. Office Depot, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Gene Moran filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against Office Depot, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John D. Early and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-02043

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John D. Early

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mr. gene moran

Gene Moran

Defendant

Office Depot, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Okorie Okorocha

Attorney at Okorocha Firm

117 East Colorado Boulevard Suite 465

Pasadena, CA 91105

Defendant Attorney

Yi Yang

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 41St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Exhibit Exhibits to complaint

#15

(#15) AMENDED COMPLAINT Office Depot, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Gene Moran (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to complaint)(Okorocha, Okorie) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Office Depot, Inc. answer now due 1/11/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Office Depot, Inc..(Yang, Yi) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#13

(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Yi Yang counsel for Defendant Office Depot, Inc.. Adding Eva Yi Yang as counsel of record for Office Depot, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Office Depot, Inc.. (Attorney Yi Yang added to party Office Depot, Inc.(pty:dft))(Yang, Yi) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#12

(#12) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Office Depot, Inc. (jp) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#11

(#11) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#10

(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gene Moran. (Okorocha, Okorie) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #8 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is directed to the incorrect defendant name on the "TO:" field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#8

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gene Moran. (Okorocha, Okorie) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff gene moran, (Okorocha, Okorie) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff gene moran. (Okorocha, Okorie) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff gene moran. (Okorocha, Okorie) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28685573 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff gene moran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Okorie Okorocha added to party gene moran(pty:pla))(Okorocha, Okorie) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AMENDED COMPLAINT Office Depot, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Gene Moran (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to complaint)(Okorocha, Okorie) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Office Depot, Inc. answer now due 1/11/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Office Depot, Inc..(Yang, Yi) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Yi Yang counsel for Defendant Office Depot, Inc.. Adding Eva Yi Yang as counsel of record for Office Depot, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Office Depot, Inc.. (Attorney Yi Yang added to party Office Depot, Inc.(pty:dft))(Yang, Yi) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Office Depot, Inc. (jp) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gene Moran. (Okorocha, Okorie) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #8 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is directed to the incorrect defendant name on the "TO:" field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gene Moran. (Okorocha, Okorie) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #2 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff gene moran, (Okorocha, Okorie) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff gene moran. (Okorocha, Okorie) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff gene moran. (Okorocha, Okorie) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28685573 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff gene moran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Okorie Okorocha added to party gene moran(pty:pla))(Okorocha, Okorie) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yi Yang