This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/05/2020 at 10:46:15 (UTC).

Moran Towing Corporation v. International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC

Case Summary

On 04/06/2020 Moran Towing Corporation filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin L.C. Feldman and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01119

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin L.C. Feldman

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Moran Towing Corporation

Defendant

International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A Harowski

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman and Dicker, LLP (New Orleans)

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2200

New Orleans, LA 70130

Katherine Wiarda Lynch

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2200

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

Kelley A. Sevin

Attorney at Duncan & Sevin, LLC

400 Poydras St., Suite 1200

New Orleans, LA 70130

Elton Ford Duncan, III

Attorney at Duncan & Sevin, LLC

400 Poydras St., Suite 1200

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#3

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE with Call-In Instructions. Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2020 10:00 AM before case manager, by telephone. (cbs) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC.Attorney Kelley A. Sevin added to party International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC(pty:dft).(Sevin, Kelley) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. The pdf should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (cwa) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC. (cwa) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (aj) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against International-Matex Tank Terminals LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8249662) filed by Moran Towing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Michael A Harowski added to party Moran Towing Corporation(pty:pla).(Harowski, Michael) (Attachments 1-2 replaced on 4/7/2020) (cwa). Modified on 4/7/2020 (cwa). (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Moran Towing Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where INTERNATIONAL-MATEX TANK TERMINALS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelley A. Sevin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elton Ford Duncan, III