This case was last updated from PACER on 05/01/2020 at 08:46:13 (UTC).

Moralis v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 Moralis filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kristi K. DuBose, P. Bradley Murray and William E. Cassady. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00123

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Judges

Kristi K. DuBose

P. Bradley Murray

William E. Cassady

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Duane Moralis

Defendants

BP Exploration & Production Inc

BP America Production Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Albertus F. Wiesedeppe

Attorney at Nations Law Firm

9703 Richmond Ave., Suite 200

Houston, TX 77042-4863

Gary L. Fuller

Attorney at Nations Law Firm

9703 Richmond Ave., Suite 200

Houston, TX 77042-4863

Howard L. Nations

Attorney at Howard L. Nations, P.C.

3131 Briarpark Dr., Suite 208

Houston, TX 77042

Defendant Attorneys

Harlan I. Prater, IV

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White

400 North 20Th Street

Birmingham, AL 35203

William H. Morrow

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White

400 North 20Th Street

Birmingham, AL 35203

Jackson Eric Knouse

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Jackson Eric Knouse on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Knouse, Jackson) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Morrow on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Morrow, William) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan I. Prater, IV on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Prater, Harlan) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-12988. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#6

(#6) Case transferred to Southern District of Alabama. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/28/2020.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.] (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#5

(#5) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc., Anthony Duane Moralis Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) Modified text/filers on 2/26/2020 (clw). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.] (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.] (Entered: 11/05/2019)

3 #3

BELO Settlement Agreement

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7890834) filed by Anthony Duane Moralis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Anthony Duane Moralis(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/06/2019)

#9

(#9) Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/4/2019. (skb) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

8 #3

Authorization

8 #2

HIPAA Protective Order

8 #1

Protective Order

8 #9

(#8) BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order, # 2 HIPAA Protective Order, # 3 Authorization) (skb) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Jackson Eric Knouse on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Knouse, Jackson) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Morrow on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Morrow, William) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan I. Prater, IV on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Prater, Harlan) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/4/2019. (skb) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order, # 2 HIPAA Protective Order, # 3 Authorization) (skb) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-12988. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred to Southern District of Alabama. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/28/2020.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.] (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc., Anthony Duane Moralis Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) Modified text/filers on 2/26/2020 (clw). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.] (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.] (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7890834) filed by Anthony Duane Moralis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Anthony Duane Moralis(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jackson Eric Knouse

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William H. Morrow