This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:47:53 (UTC).

Morales v. Napleton's Schaumburg Subaru, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Morales filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Napleton's Schaumburg Subaru, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald A. Guzman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03348

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald A. Guzman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joya I. Morales

Defendants

Napleton Schaumburg Motors, Inc.

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Napleton's Schaumburg Subaru, Inc.

Joseph T. Snyder & Associates, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Saranteas

Attorney at Saranteas Law

2020 N. California Ave., #355

Chicago, IL 60647

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joya I. Morales. Joseph T. Snyder & Associates, Ltd. waiver sent on 5/18/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Saranteas, James) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joya I. Morales. Napleton's Schaumburg Subaru, Inc. waiver sent on 5/18/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Saranteas, James) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#10

(#10) STATUS Report by Joya I. Morales (Saranteas, James) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joya I. Morales by James Saranteas (Saranteas, James) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joya I. Morales. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 5/18/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Saranteas, James) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joya I. Morales Rule 41 Notice of Dismissal of Certain Allegations as to METLIFE Only (Saranteas, James) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Joya I. Morales; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15839631. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A through B)(Saranteas, James) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joya I. Morales. Napleton Schaumburg Motors, Inc. waiver sent on 5/18/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Saranteas, James) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#4

(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 7/17/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Saranteas, James) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #1

Exhibits A through B

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STATUS Report by Joya I. Morales (Saranteas, James) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joya I. Morales. Napleton's Schaumburg Subaru, Inc. waiver sent on 5/18/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Saranteas, James) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joya I. Morales Rule 41 Notice of Dismissal of Certain Allegations as to METLIFE Only (Saranteas, James) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joya I. Morales. Napleton Schaumburg Motors, Inc. waiver sent on 5/18/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Saranteas, James) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joya I. Morales. Joseph T. Snyder & Associates, Ltd. waiver sent on 5/18/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Saranteas, James) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joya I. Morales. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 5/18/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Saranteas, James) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 7/17/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Saranteas, James) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joya I. Morales by James Saranteas (Saranteas, James) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Joya I. Morales; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15839631. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A through B)(Saranteas, James) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.