This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:32:11 (UTC).

Morales v. FSI Restaurant Development Limited

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Morales filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against FSI Restaurant Development Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith P Ellison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00593

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Keith P Ellison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Refugio Morales

Defendants

FSI Restaurant Development Limited d/b/a Saltgrass Steak House

FSI Restaurant Development Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan S Stoger

Attorney at Stoger Law Firm

2301 Morse

Houston, TX 77019

Thomas N Thurlow

Attorney at Thurlow & Associates

440 Louisiana, Ste 1200

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

William Scott Helfand

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

24 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77046

Andrew William Gray

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois et al

24 Greenway Plaza, Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77046

 

Court Documents

5 #3

Proposed Order

5 #2

Exhibit

#5

(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by FSI Restaurant Development Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Helfand, William) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit

#14

(#14) REPLY in Support of #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by FSI Restaurant Development Limited. (Helfand, William) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit Notice of Removal

4 #2

Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition

4 #3

Exhibit Receipt

4 #4

Exhibit Docket Sheet

4 #5

Exhibit Affidavit of Thomas N. Thurlow

4 #6

Exhibit Return of Service

4 #7

Exhibit Defense Email

4 #8

Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiff Refugio Morales' Motion to Remand

#4

(#4) MOTION to Remand by Refugio Morales, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit Receipt, #4 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of Thomas N. Thurlow, #6 Exhibit Return of Service, #7 Exhibit Defense Email, #8 Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiff Refugio Morales' Motion to Remand)(Thurlow, Thomas) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#13

(#13) REPLY to Response to #4 MOTION to Remand, filed by Refugio Morales. (Stoger, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#12

(#12) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by FSI Restaurant Development Limited, filed.(Helfand, William) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE Disclosure of Interested Parties by Refugio Morales, filed. (Thurlow, Thomas) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S. Stoger on behalf of Refugio Morales, filed. (Stoger, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPLY in Support of #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by FSI Restaurant Development Limited. (Helfand, William) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REPLY to Response to #4 MOTION to Remand, filed by Refugio Morales. (Stoger, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by FSI Restaurant Development Limited, filed.(Helfand, William) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE Disclosure of Interested Parties by Refugio Morales, filed. (Thurlow, Thomas) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S. Stoger on behalf of Refugio Morales, filed. (Stoger, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Refugio Morales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1--Plaintiff's Original Petition, #2 Exhibit 2--Cancellation Receipt, #3 Exhibit 3--Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4--Affidavit of Thomas N. Thurlow, #5 Exhibit 5--EEOC Letter, #6 Exhibit 6--MoralesFirstAmendedComplaint draft01, #7 Exhibit 7--Defendant's Original Answer, #8 Exhibit 8--Plaintiff's Discovery, #9 Exhibit 9--Return of Citation, #10 Exhibit 10--Defendant's Discovery Responses, #11 Exhibit 11--Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #12 Proposed Order Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Failure to State a Claim)(Thurlow, Thomas) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Remand, filed by FSI Restaurant Development Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Helfand, William) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice Regarding Initial Conference(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Jury Trial. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by FSI Restaurant Development Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Helfand, William) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Remand by Refugio Morales, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit Receipt, #4 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of Thomas N. Thurlow, #6 Exhibit Return of Service, #7 Exhibit Defense Email, #8 Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiff Refugio Morales' Motion to Remand)(Thurlow, Thomas) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Jury Trial by Refugio Morales, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/21/2019. (Thurlow, Thomas) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/26/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 157th Harris County, case number 2018-51117 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21911024) filed by FSI Restaurant Development Limited d/b/a Saltgrass Steak House. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Helfand, William) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.