Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/08/2020 at 16:41:12 (UTC).

Morales v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Morales filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Guaderrama. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00201

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Guaderrama

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Claudia Morales

Defendants

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Equifax Information Services LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.,

Trans Union LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carla Leticia Sanchez-Adams

Attorney at Texas RioGrande Legal Aid, Inc.

4920 N. Ih 35

Austin, TX 78751

Robert Sola

Attorney at Robert S. Sola, P.C.

1500 Sw First Avenue, Suite 800

Portland, OR 97201

Stephanie James

Attorney at Texas RioGrande Legal Aid, Inc.

1331 Texas Ave.

El Paso, TX 79901

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Durell

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

600 Congress Ave., Suite 2200

Austin, TX 78701

Benjamin David Lee Foster

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

600 Congress Ave., Ste. 2200

Austin, TX 78701

Robert T. Mowrey

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2200

Dallas, TX 75201-6766

Forrest Mathew Seger, III

Attorney at Clark Hill Strasburger

2301 Broadway

San Antonio, TX 78215

Ryan W. Wham

Attorney at Jones Day

717 Texas Street, Suite 3300

Houston, TX 77002

Valerie Renee Auger

Attorney at Mann Morrow, PLLC

671 South Mesa Hills, Suite A-1

El Paso, TX 79912

Paul L. Myers

Attorney at Quilling, Selander, Lownds, Winslett & Moser, P.C.

6900 Dallas Parkway, Suite 800

Plano, TX 75024

Laura Enriquez

Attorney at Mounce, Green, Myers, Safi, Paxson & Galatzan

P.O. Drawer 1977

El Paso, TX 79999-1977

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Claudia Morales. (Sanchez-Adams, Carla) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES to File a Proposed Scheduling Order and a Joint Report for the Court's consideration by 9/25/2020. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (mc4) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative and Other Defenses by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Seger, Forrest) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#16

(#16) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Durell, Daniel) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#15

(#15) DEFENDANT Wells Fargo Bank, N.A's ANSWER to Plaintiff's Original Petition by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Durell, Daniel) Modified on 8/20/2020 (mc4). (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura Enriquez on behalf of Trans Union LLC (Enriquez, Laura) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Valerie Renee Auger on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc., . Attorney Valerie Renee Auger added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc., (pty:dft) (Auger, Valerie) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, Unopposed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Durell, Daniel) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Parties by Trans Union LLC. (Myers, Paul) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Myers, Paul) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Durell, Daniel) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.,.(Wham, Ryan) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., . (Wham, Ryan) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

1 #2

Supplement

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13748014), filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)(Wham, Ryan) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Claudia Morales. (Sanchez-Adams, Carla) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES to File a Proposed Scheduling Order and a Joint Report for the Court's consideration by 9/25/2020. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (mc4) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative and Other Defenses by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Seger, Forrest) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Durell, Daniel) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DEFENDANT Wells Fargo Bank, N.A's ANSWER to Plaintiff's Original Petition by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Durell, Daniel) Modified on 8/20/2020 (mc4). (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura Enriquez on behalf of Trans Union LLC (Enriquez, Laura) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Valerie Renee Auger on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc., . Attorney Valerie Renee Auger added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc., (pty:dft) (Auger, Valerie) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 8/21/2020. (mc4) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant Wells Fargo's deadline to file an answer or other responsive pleading is now August 21, 2020. The Court cautions that, in the future, if Defendant Wells Fargo seeks further extensions of time to file a pleading, it must do so days in advance of the filing deadline. Further, the Court cautions Defendant Wells Fargo that it will not entertain further motions to extend the deadline to file an answer or other responsive pleading. entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pc) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, Unopposed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Durell, Daniel) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seger, Forrest) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin David Lee Foster on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Foster, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Parties by Trans Union LLC. (Myers, Paul) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Myers, Paul) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Durell, Daniel) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.,.(Wham, Ryan) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (jg1) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David C Guaderrama. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jg1) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., . (Wham, Ryan) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13748014), filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)(Wham, Ryan) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant