This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2022 at 07:34:28 (UTC).

Morales v. Cimarron Energy, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 Morales filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Cimarron Energy, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Eskridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-03219

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Morales

Defendant

Cimarron Energy, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Armando A. Ortiz

Attorney at Fitapelli & Schaffer LLP

28 Liberty Street, 30Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Richard J Burch

Attorney at Bruckner Burch PLLC

11 Greenway Plaza, Ste 3025

Houston, TX 77046

Defendant Attorney

Marcia Nelson Jackson

Attorney at Wick Phillips Gould & Martin, LLP

3131 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75204

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Cimarron Energy, Inc., filed.(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Cimarron Energy, Inc. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Cimarron Energy, Inc. served on 9/22/2022, answer due 11/21/2022, filed.(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/30/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Charles Eskridge(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(JosephWells, 4) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 02/03/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 01/04/2023. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 08/02/2023. Deft Expert Report due by 09/01/2023. Discovery due by 10/17/2023. Mediation due by 01/03/2024. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/16/2023. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/16/2023. Joint Pretrial Order due by 02/02/2024. Docket Call set for 03/19/2024 at 1:30 PM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (josephwells) (Entered: 9/29/2022) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by David Morales, filed.(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Armando A. Ortiz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Morales, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/18/2022. (Ortiz, Armando) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#9

(#9) CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action for Jeff Currie by David Morales, filed.(Ortiz, Armando) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cimarron Energy, Inc., filed.(Jackson, Marcia) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cimarron Energy, Inc., filed.(Jackson, Marcia) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Armando A. Ortiz to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#13

(#13) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by David Morales, filed.(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by David Morales, filed.(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Armando A. Ortiz to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cimarron Energy, Inc., filed.(Jackson, Marcia) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cimarron Energy, Inc., filed.(Jackson, Marcia) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action for Jeff Currie by David Morales, filed.(Ortiz, Armando) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Armando A. Ortiz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Morales, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/18/2022. (Ortiz, Armando) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by David Morales, filed.(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 02/03/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 01/04/2023. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 08/02/2023. Deft Expert Report due by 09/01/2023. Discovery due by 10/17/2023. Mediation due by 01/03/2024. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/16/2023. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/16/2023. Joint Pretrial Order due by 02/02/2024. Docket Call set for 03/19/2024 at 1:30 PM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (josephwells) (Entered: 9/29/2022) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/30/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Charles Eskridge(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(JosephWells, 4) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Cimarron Energy, Inc. served on 9/22/2022, answer due 11/21/2022, filed.(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Cimarron Energy, Inc. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Cimarron Energy, Inc., filed.(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cimarron Energy, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28804602) filed by David Morales. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcia Nelson Jackson