This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:30:19 (UTC).

Morales v. Cidan Machinery, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Morales filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Cidan Machinery, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Manish S. Shah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00081

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manish S. Shah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Morales

Defendant

CIDAN MACHINERY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph J. Miroballi

Attorney at Miroballi Durkin & Rudin LLC

180 Lasalle Street, Suite 3650

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mark Morales by Joseph J. Miroballi and Richard J. Rosenblum (Miroballi, Joseph) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Miroballi, Joseph) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mark Morales by Joseph J. Miroballi (Miroballi, Joseph) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 3/6/20 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mark Morales by Joseph J. Miroballi and Adam Budz (Miroballi, Joseph) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Mark Morales as to Cidan Machinery, Inc.. (Rosenblum, Richard) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Morales as to Cidan Machinery, Inc. on 2/19/2020, answer due 3/11/2020. (Miroballi, Joseph) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Mark Morales as to Cidan Machinery, Inc.. (Miroballi, Joseph) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: At plaintiff's request, and in order to allow time for the defendant to appear and answer to the complaint, the status hearing on 3/6/20 is stricken and reset to 3/18/20 at 9:30 a.m. An initial status report is due three days prior. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Mark Morales; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16582825.(Miroballi, Joseph) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: At plaintiff's request, and in order to allow time for the defendant to appear and answer to the complaint, the status hearing on 3/6/20 is stricken and reset to 3/18/20 at 9:30 a.m. An initial status report is due three days prior. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Morales as to Cidan Machinery, Inc. on 2/19/2020, answer due 3/11/2020. (Miroballi, Joseph) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Cidan Machinery, Inc.. (txl, ) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Mark Morales as to Cidan Machinery, Inc.. (Miroballi, Joseph) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Cidan Machinery, Inc.. (jg, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Mark Morales as to Cidan Machinery, Inc.. (Rosenblum, Richard) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 3/6/20 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Cidan Machinery, Inc. (jg, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mark Morales by Joseph J. Miroballi and Adam Budz (Miroballi, Joseph) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mark Morales by Joseph J. Miroballi and Richard J. Rosenblum (Miroballi, Joseph) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mark Morales by Joseph J. Miroballi (Miroballi, Joseph) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Miroballi, Joseph) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Mark Morales; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16582825.(Miroballi, Joseph) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.