This case was last updated from PACER on 09/11/2021 at 08:08:08 (UTC).

Morales Ramirez v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 Morales Ramirez filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against GlaxoSmithKline LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-81640

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oscar Morales Ramirez

Defendants

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.

GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C.

Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation

Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V.

Boehringer Ingelheim U.S.A. Corporation

Inc Pfizer

Sanofi US Services Inc.,

SANOFI S.A

SANOFI-AVENTIC U.S. LLC

Acic Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Methapharm, Inc.

Ajanta Pharma USA Inc.

Ajanta Pharma Ltd.

AmerisourceBergen Corporation

Amerisource Health Services, LLC d/b/a American Health Packaging

American Health Packaging

76 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan

Attorney at Quetglas Law Office P.S.C.

1353 Luis Vigoreaux Ave., Pmb 669

Guaynabo, PR 00966

 

Court Documents

7 #1

*Restricted*

7 #7

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

6 #2

Tag-Along Actions List

6 #1

Certified CTO-74

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) E-MAIL NOTIFICATION from MDL: Minute Order to all involved clerks informing that a case transfer of this case to the Southern District of Florida shall be effective when we receive a certified copy of the Transfer Order from the transferee court. (mcm) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

#4

(#4) E-MAIL NOTIFICATION RE: MDL 2924, informing that this case forms part of CTO-74 for transfer to the Southern District of Florida and that the stay for CTO-74 has been lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/3/2021. (mcm) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION to transfer case filed by Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

1 #2

Category Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • Docket(#9) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Puerto Rico. Case Number 3:21-cv-01381 with documents 1-6. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81640-RLR Morales Ramirez v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al on 9/10/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 74. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Docket(#8) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from Puerto Rico; Case Number 3:21-cv-01381. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TRANSFER LETTER from U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida, transferee court, with certified copy of CTO-74 in MDL No. 2924 and List of Tag-Along Actions. Their case number is 9:20-md-02924-RLR. This case is hereby closed. (Attachments: #1 Certified CTO-74, #2 Tag-Along Actions List) (rim) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) E-MAIL NOTIFICATION from MDL: Minute Order to all involved clerks informing that a case transfer of this case to the Southern District of Florida shall be effective when we receive a certified copy of the Transfer Order from the transferee court. (mcm) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) E-MAIL NOTIFICATION RE: MDL 2924, informing that this case forms part of CTO-74 for transfer to the Southern District of Florida and that the stay for CTO-74 has been lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/3/2021. (mcm) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to transfer case filed by Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7418688.), filed by Oscar Morales Ramirez. Service due by 11/16/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Methapharm, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Amerisource Health Services, LLC d/b/a American Health Packaging is a litigant

Latest cases where Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH is a litigant