This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2020 at 08:08:43 (UTC).

Morales Posada v. Cultural Care, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 Morales Posada filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Cultural Care, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Indira Talwani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11862

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Indira Talwani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karen Morales Posada

Defendant

Cultural Care, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Hollis Seligman

Attorney at Towards Justice

Po Box 371680, Pmb 44465

Denver, CO 80237-5680

Defendant Attorney

Harvey J. Wolkoff

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

111 Huntington Avenue, Suite 520

Boston, MA 02199

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/24/2020 to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Cultural Care, Inc..(Wolkoff, Harvey) Modified on 11/25/2020: Corrected event type (Kelly, Danielle). (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Harvey J. Wolkoff on behalf of Cultural Care, Inc. (Wolkoff, Harvey) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#4

(#4) Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiff Requesting Issuance of Summons to Cultural Care, Inc.. (Seligman, David) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Cultural Care, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

1 #2

Category Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cultural Care, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8464927 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Karen Morales Posada. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Seligman, David) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER allowing Joint Motion for Extension of Time #7 . Defendant's deadline to respond to the complaint is continued to December 24, 2020, and Plaintiff's deadline to respond to the anticipated motion to dismiss is continued to January 14, 2021. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/24/2020 to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Cultural Care, Inc..(Wolkoff, Harvey) Modified on 11/25/2020: Corrected event type (Kelly, Danielle). (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Harvey J. Wolkoff on behalf of Cultural Care, Inc. (Wolkoff, Harvey) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel is directed to the docket text #3 and attached summons for issuance of summons in this matter. As directed in docket text "Summons Issued as to Cultural Care, Inc. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1." Docket text #3 . (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiff Requesting Issuance of Summons to Cultural Care, Inc.. (Seligman, David) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Cultural Care, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cultural Care, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8464927 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Karen Morales Posada. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Seligman, David) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less