This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/11/2019 at 07:53:28 (UTC).

Morales Granados v. Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 Morales Granados filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Guaderrama. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00158

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Guaderrama

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Guadalupe Morales Granados

Defendants

Field & Streams Sporting Goods, Inc.

Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lisa A. Elizondo

Defendant Attorneys

Celia Garcia

John A. Guerra

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Letter/Correspondence Acknowledgement from 448th Judicial District on 7/16/19 regarding Case Remand. (em) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#5

(#5) Letter/Correspondence regarding Remand to the 448th Judicial District Court, El Paso County, Texas. (em) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Remand to State Court, 448 Judicial District Court of El Paso County, Texas. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#3

(#3) Unopposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Maria Guadalupe Morales Granados. (Elizondo, Lisa) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of email address change by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. (Garcia, Celia) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12221104), filed by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Garcia, Celia) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter/Correspondence Acknowledgement from 448th Judicial District on 7/16/19 regarding Case Remand. (em) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter/Correspondence regarding Remand to the 448th Judicial District Court, El Paso County, Texas. (em) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Remand to State Court, 448 Judicial District Court of El Paso County, Texas. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Unopposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Maria Guadalupe Morales Granados. (Elizondo, Lisa) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of email address change by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. (Garcia, Celia) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Remark: All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge David C. Guaderrama located at http://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/Rules/StandingOrders/default.asp#elpaso. (mn) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (mn) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge David C Guaderrama. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mn) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12221104), filed by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Garcia, Celia) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less