This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2022 at 14:12:25 (UTC).

Morado v. Wells Fargo et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 Morado filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wells Fargo. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jason K. Pulliam and Henry J. Bemporad. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00975

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jason K. Pulliam

Referral Judge

Henry J. Bemporad

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cecilia Morado

Defendants

DIEBOLD NIXDORF, INC.

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raul Baray Rodriguez

Attorney at Raul B. Rodriguez Law P.C.

111 Arciniega Street

San Antonio, TX 78205

Defendant Attorneys

Caitlin E. Bratt

Attorney at Brock Guerra Standmo Dimaline Jones PC

2110 Domal Ln

San Antonio, TX 78247

John A. Guerra

Attorney at Brock Guerra Strandmo Dimaline Jones, P.C.

17339 Redland Road

San Antonio, TX 78247-2304

Kristina Fernandez

Attorney at Donnell Kieschnick Wolter & Gamez

615 N Upper Broadway, Suite 1100

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Fernandez, Kristina) Modified on 11/1/2022 to edit text (nm). (Entered: 10/31/2022)

#14

(#14) NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Diebold Nixdorf, Inc.. (Bratt, Caitlin) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

13 #1

Bates Stamped 000001-000109

13 #13

Main Document

12 #1

Exhibit Bates Stamped 000001-000109

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) ORDER SETTING VIDEO INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2022 2:30 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad,). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (nm) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#10

(#10) Def Wells Fargo Bank NA's ANSWER to #1 Complaint of Celilia Morado. Attorney Kristina Fernandez added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Fernandez, Kristina) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Caitlin E. Bratt added to party Diebold Nixdorf, Inc.(pty:dft) by Diebold Nixdorf, Inc..(Bratt, Caitlin) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cecilia Morado. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 9/29/2022, answer due 10/20/2022. (Rodriguez, Raul) Modified on 10/5/2022 to edit text (nm). (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cecilia Morado. Diebold Nixdorf, Inc. served on 9/22/2022, answer due 10/13/2022. (Rodriguez, Raul) Modified on 9/30/2022, to edit text (mgr). (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (nm) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Diebold Nixdorf, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (nm) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cecilia Morado. Request for Issuance of Summons (Rodriguez, Raul) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER for procedure in cases before Judge Pulliam. All parties and counsel are directed to review Judge Pulliam's Standing Order containing rules of practice, particularly the requirement of conference before filing a Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule 12(b)(6) and demonstration of complete diversity. Failure to follow these rules of practice could result in the Court striking the Motion to Dismiss on its own initiative without further notice. Signed by Judge Jason Pulliam. (Entered: 09/12/2022)

#2

DEFICIENCY NOTICE:***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT-INCORRECT FORM USED. PLEASE REFILE USING FORM AO 440*** re #2 Request for Issuance of Summons (nm) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Fernandez, Kristina) Modified on 11/1/2022 to edit text (nm). (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Diebold Nixdorf, Inc.. (Bratt, Caitlin) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Pretrial Disclosures Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Cecilia Morado. (Attachments: #1 Bates Stamped 000001-000109)(Rodriguez, Raul) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFICIENCY NOTICE:***MISSING ATTORNEY SIGNATURE BLOCK*** re #12 Pretrial Disclosures (nm) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT-MISSING ATTORNEY SIGNATURE BLOCK***Pretrial Disclosures Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Cecilia Morado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bates Stamped 000001-000109)(Rodriguez, Raul) Modified on 10/26/2022 (nm). (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING VIDEO INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2022 2:30 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad,). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (nm) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Def Wells Fargo Bank NA's ANSWER to #1 Complaint of Celilia Morado. Attorney Kristina Fernandez added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Fernandez, Kristina) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Caitlin E. Bratt added to party Diebold Nixdorf, Inc.(pty:dft) by Diebold Nixdorf, Inc..(Bratt, Caitlin) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction: ENTRY WAS EDITED TO REFLECT THE CORRECT ANSWER DUE DATE re #8 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. (nm) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cecilia Morado. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 9/29/2022, answer due 10/20/2022. (Rodriguez, Raul) Modified on 10/5/2022 to edit text (nm). (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cecilia Morado. Diebold Nixdorf, Inc. served on 9/22/2022, answer due 10/13/2022. (Rodriguez, Raul) Modified on 9/30/2022, to edit text (mgr). (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (nm) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Diebold Nixdorf, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (nm) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cecilia Morado. Request for Issuance of Summons (Rodriguez, Raul) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFICIENCY NOTICE:***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT-INCORRECT FORM USED. PLEASE REFILE USING FORM AO 440*** re #2 Request for Issuance of Summons (nm) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER for procedure in cases before Judge Pulliam. All parties and counsel are directed to review Judge Pulliam's Standing Order containing rules of practice, particularly the requirement of conference before filing a Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule 12(b)(6) and demonstration of complete diversity. Failure to follow these rules of practice could result in the Court striking the Motion to Dismiss on its own initiative without further notice. Signed by Judge Jason Pulliam. (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT-INCORRECT FORM USED***REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cecilia Morado. Request fro Issuance of Summons (Rodriguez, Raul) Modified on 9/12/2022 (nm). (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (nm) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (nm) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Diebold Nixford Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16499611), filed by Cecilia Morado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Rodriguez, Raul) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less