This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2020 at 08:36:34 (UTC).

Mora v. Allergan Sales, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 Mora filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Allergan Sales, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Monte C. Richardson and Marcia Morales Howard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00912

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Monte C. Richardson

Presiding Judge

Marcia Morales Howard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kassandra E. Mora

Defendants

Allergan Sales, LLC

Ricardo E. Mojica

Boca Raton, FL 33431-4051

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Shakib

Attorney at Terrell Hogan, PA

8Th Floor, 233 E Bay St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer M. Voss

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 2900

Tampa, FL 33602-5810

Rebecca Marie Harris

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP

100 N. Tampa St., Ste. 2900

Tampa, FL 33602

Brian T. Guthrie

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 2900

Tampa, FL 33602-5810

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Stay. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 8/17/2020. (JW) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION by Kassandra E. Mora. (Shakib, Christopher) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT against Allergan Sales, LLC, Ricardo E. Mojica with Jury Demand filed by Kassandra E. Mora. (originally filed in State Court) (RH) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Allergan Sales, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Allergan, Inc., Corporate Parent AbbVie, Inc., Corporate Parent Allergan Limited for Allergan Sales, LLC.. (Voss, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

2 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#2

(#2) MOTION to Stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Allergan Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Voss, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Affidavit Exhibit 3

1 #2

State Court Other Documents Exhibit 2

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, case number 16-2020-CA-004041 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17176211 filed by Allergan Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit 1, #2 State Court Other Documents Exhibit 2, #3 Affidavit Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Voss, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Stay. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 8/17/2020. (JW) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION by Kassandra E. Mora. (Shakib, Christopher) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against Allergan Sales, LLC, Ricardo E. Mojica with Jury Demand filed by Kassandra E. Mora. (originally filed in State Court) (RH) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Allergan Sales, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Allergan, Inc., Corporate Parent AbbVie, Inc., Corporate Parent Allergan Limited for Allergan Sales, LLC.. (Voss, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:20-cv-912-J-34MCR. (SJB) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Allergan Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Voss, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, case number 16-2020-CA-004041 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17176211 filed by Allergan Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit 1, #2 State Court Other Documents Exhibit 2, #3 Affidavit Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Voss, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allergan Sales, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca Marie Harris

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRIAN TERRY GUTHRIE