This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/28/2022 at 08:53:10 (UTC).

Moore v. U.S. Bank National Association et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2022 Moore filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against U S Bank National Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Roseann Ketchmark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00212

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roseann Ketchmark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicholas Moore

Defendants

U.S. Bank National Association

U.S. Bancorp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey J Carey

Attorney at Carey Law Firm, LLC

229 Se Douglas Street, Suite 210

Lee'S Summit, MO 64063

Defendant Attorneys

Sara Elizabeth Welch

Attorney at Stinson LLP - KC 2900

1201 Walnut St., Ste. 2900

Kansas City, MO 64106

Erin M Naeger

Attorney at Stinson LLP - KC 2900

1201 Walnut St., Ste. 2900

Kansas City, MO 64106

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court File

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Exhibit A Notice of Removal

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

MAP General Order

#4

(#4) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 5/1/2022.Proposed scheduling order due by 5/15/2022. Signed on April 1, 2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Sara Elizabeth Welch on behalf of Defendants U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank National Association.(Welch, Sara) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association.(Welch, Sara) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION of dismissal of Defendant U.S. Bancorp by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank National Association. (Naeger, Erin) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Sara Elizabeth Welch on behalf of Defendants U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank National Association.(Welch, Sara) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#10

(#10) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by U.S. Bank National Association. (Welch, Sara) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Jeffrey J Carey on behalf of Plaintiff Nicholas Moore.(Carey, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/30/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2023. Status Conference set for 7/10/2023 08:30 AM via teleconference. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2023 11:30 AM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2023 11:30 AM, and Jury Trial set for 7/10/2023 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Signed on May 20, 2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • Docket(#13) updated NOTICE OF HEARING (Initial Pretrial Conference date change) - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 6/16/2023 11:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/30/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2023. Status Conference set for 7/10/2023 08:30 AM via teleconference. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2023 11:30 AM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2023 11:30 AM, and Jury Trial set for 7/10/2023 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Signed on May 20, 2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Jeffrey J Carey on behalf of Plaintiff Nicholas Moore.(Carey, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by U.S. Bank National Association. (Welch, Sara) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Sara Elizabeth Welch on behalf of Defendants U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank National Association.(Welch, Sara) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order of Dismissal per #7 STIPULATION of dismissal of Defendant U.S. Bancorp . Signed on April 12, 2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION of dismissal of Defendant U.S. Bancorp by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank National Association. (Naeger, Erin) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association.(Welch, Sara) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Sara Elizabeth Welch on behalf of Defendants U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank National Association.(Welch, Sara) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 5/1/2022.Proposed scheduling order due by 5/15/2022. Signed on April 1, 2022 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank National Association re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Removal)(Welch, Sara) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County County, case number 2116-CV27522, filed by Sara Elizabeth Welch. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7865802. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Welch, Sara) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US Bancorp is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin M Naeger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sara Elizabeth Welch