This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2022 at 08:38:31 (UTC).

Moore v. Transco Lines Inc

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Moore filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Transco Lines Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Billy Roy Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01156

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Billy Roy Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Moore

Defendant

Transco Lines Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Colby Qualls

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm, PLLC

Kirkpatrick Plaza, Suite 510, 10800 Financial Centre Parkway

Little Rock, AR 72211

Joshua Sanford

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm, PLLC

Kirkpatrick Plaza, Suite 510, 10800 Financial Centre Parkway

Little Rock, AR 72211

Defendant Attorneys

Alvin Jackson Finklea, III

Attorney at Scopelitis, Garvin, Light, Hanson, & Feary

10 West Market Street, Suite 1400, Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2968

Andrew R. Brehm

Attorney at Scopelitis, Garvin, Light, Hanson & Ferry PC

330 East Kilbourn Avenue, Suite 827

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Kerrilee Elizabeth Kobbeman

Attorney at Conner & Winters, LLP

4375 North Vantage Drive, Suite 405

Fayetteville, AR 72703

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Moore. Transco Lines Inc served on 12/14/2021. (Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kerrilee Elizabeth Kobbeman on behalf of Transco Lines Inc (Kobbeman, Kerrilee) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#4

(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/7/2022. Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/21/2022. Bench Trial set for 12/27/2022 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 12/28/21. (mmb) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Transco Lines Inc (Kobbeman, Kerrilee) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Transco Lines Inc.(Kobbeman, Kerrilee) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Transco Lines Inc (Kobbeman, Kerrilee) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Andrew R. Brehm is admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/18/22. (mmb) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Alvin Jackson Finklea, III, is admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/18/22. (mmb) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Transco Lines Inc (Kobbeman, Kerrilee) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Andrew R. Brehm. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4185976. Filed by Transco Lines Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Kobbeman, Kerrilee) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Alvin Jackson Finklea, III. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4185969. Filed by Transco Lines Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Kobbeman, Kerrilee) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Transco Lines Inc.(Kobbeman, Kerrilee) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendant's answer or responsive pleading must be filed by 5 p.m., Tuesday, January 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/28/21. (dmm) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Transco Lines Inc (Kobbeman, Kerrilee) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/7/2022. Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/21/2022. Bench Trial set for 12/27/2022 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 12/28/21. (mmb) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kerrilee Elizabeth Kobbeman on behalf of Transco Lines Inc (Kobbeman, Kerrilee) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Moore. Transco Lines Inc served on 12/14/2021. (Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate that summons were issued and returned to counsel for service. (jak) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORIGINAL COMPLAINT - COLLECTIVE ACTION filed by Richard Moore against Transco Lines Inc ( Fee $402, Receipt Number LIT084614; Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff's Counsel for service). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ldb)(Docket text modified on 11/24/2021 to indicate summons were issued)(jak) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Transco Lines, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kerrilee Elizabeth Kobbeman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew R. Brehm