This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/10/2021 at 08:00:34 (UTC).

Moore v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 Moore filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-00172

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Thomas Moore

Defendant

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael S. Davenport

Attorney at The Law Office of Michael Davenport, P.C.

2505 South College Road

Wilmington, NC 28412

Tracie H. Brisson

Attorney at Law Office of Tracie Brisson, PC

803-G South College Road

Wilmington, NC 28403

Defendant Attorneys

J. Scott Lewis

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP

6752 Rock Spring Road, Suite 310

Wilmington, NC 28405

Diane K. Pappayliou

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP

6752 Rock Spring Road, Suite 310

Wilmington, NC 28405

Shelley Walters Coleman

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP

6752 Rock Spring Road, Suite 310

Wilmington, NC 28405

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Financial Disclosure Statement by James Thomas Moore (Davenport, Michael) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#11

(#11) Notice of Appearance filed by Tracie H. Brisson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Brisson, Tracie) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#10

(#10) Notice of Appearance filed by Michael S. Davenport on behalf of James Thomas Moore. (Davenport, Michael) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#9

(#9) Memorandum in Support regarding #8 Consent MOTION to Stay Pending Appraisal filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

8 #4

Text of Proposed Order proposed Order granting Stay

8 #3

Exhibit 3 - 9-23-21 letter naming appraiser

8 #2

Exhibit 2 - 9-8-21 letter demanding appraisal

8 #1

Exhibit 1 - Certified Policy

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION to Stay Pending Appraisal filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certified Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - 9-8-21 letter demanding appraisal, #3 Exhibit 3 - 9-23-21 letter naming appraiser, #4 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order granting Stay) (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#6

(#6) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel, Tracie Brisson of Law Office of Traci Brisson, P.C. at 803G South College Road, Wilmington, NC 28403 and Michael S. Davenport of Law Office of Michael Davenport, P.C. at 2505 South College Road, Wilmington, NC 28405 mailed via US Mail on October 13, 2021. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#5

#4

1 #4

Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - New Hanover County pleadings served

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Financial Disclosure Statement by James Thomas Moore (Davenport, Michael) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance filed by Tracie H. Brisson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Brisson, Tracie) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance filed by Michael S. Davenport on behalf of James Thomas Moore. (Davenport, Michael) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #8 Consent MOTION to Stay Pending Appraisal. (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Memorandum in Support regarding #8 Consent MOTION to Stay Pending Appraisal filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION to Stay Pending Appraisal filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certified Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - 9-8-21 letter demanding appraisal, #3 Exhibit 3 - 9-23-21 letter naming appraiser, #4 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order granting Stay) (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel, Tracie Brisson of Law Office of Traci Brisson, P.C. at 803G South College Road, Wilmington, NC 28403 and Michael S. Davenport of Law Office of Michael Davenport, P.C. at 2505 South College Road, Wilmington, NC 28405 mailed via US Mail on October 13, 2021. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Shelley Walters Coleman on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Coleman, Shelley) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Diane K. Pappayliou on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Pappayliou, Diane) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by J. Scott Lewis on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from New Hanover County Superior Court, case number 21 CVS 3449. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6269163), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - New Hanover County pleadings served, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diane K. Pappayliou

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shelley Walters Coleman