This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:07:23 (UTC).

Moore v. SGT 2000, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Moore filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SGT 2000, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith P Ellison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02514

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Keith P Ellison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald Moore

Defendants

SGT 2000, Inc.

St. David's Georgetown Hospital

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dennis James Bentley

Attorney at Thomas J. Henry Law, PLLC

5711 University Heights Boulevard, Suite 101, Corpus Christi

San Antonio, TX 78249

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey Osmon Marshall

Attorney at Wilson Elser et al

901 Main St, Ste 4800

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

5 #9

Proposed Order

5 #8

Exhibit

5 #7

Exhibit

5 #6

Exhibit

5 #5

Exhibit

5 #4

Exhibit

5 #3

Exhibit

5 #2

Exhibit

5 #1

Exhibit

#5

(#5) MOTION to Remand by Donald Moore, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Proposed Order)(Bentley, Dennis) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Donald Moore, filed.(Bentley, Dennis) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/16/2020 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(DawnWaggoneradi, 4) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Notice of Removal by SGT 2000, Inc., filed.(Marshall, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 55th Judicial District Court Harris County, case number 202024446-7 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24935436) filed by SGT 2000, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of Documents, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Marshall, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand by Donald Moore, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Proposed Order)(Bentley, Dennis) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Donald Moore, filed.(Bentley, Dennis) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/16/2020 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(DawnWaggoneradi, 4) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Notice of Removal by SGT 2000, Inc., filed.(Marshall, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 55th Judicial District Court Harris County, case number 202024446-7 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24935436) filed by SGT 2000, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of Documents, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Marshall, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less