This case was last updated from PACER on 03/19/2021 at 07:26:48 (UTC).

Drew Moore v. Lakeside Medical Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2021 Drew Moore filed an Other lawsuit against Lakeside Medical Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria A. Audero and Percy Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00462

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Drew Moore

Defendants

Lakeside Medical Group, Inc.

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Todd M Friedman

Attorney at Law Office of Todd M Friedman PC

21550 Oxnard Street Suite 780

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Adrian Robert Bacon

Attorney at Law Offices of Todd M Friedman PC

21550 Oxnard Street Suite 780

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-00462 PA(MAAx). (rn) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-00462 JVS(MAAx). (rn) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Drew Moore. upon Lakeside Medical Group, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Hunter Eley. (Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Lakeside Medical Group, Inc. (et) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Drew Moore, (Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Drew Moore. (Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Drew Moore. (Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30089350 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Drew Moore. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Drew Moore(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-00462 PA(MAAx). (rn) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-00462 JVS(MAAx). (rn) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Drew Moore. upon Lakeside Medical Group, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Hunter Eley. (Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Lakeside Medical Group, Inc. (et) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Drew Moore, (Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Drew Moore. (Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Drew Moore. (Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30089350 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Drew Moore. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Drew Moore(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lakeside Medical Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd M Friedman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adrian Robert Bacon