This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2022 at 05:40:06 (UTC).

Chasity Moore v. First Transit, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 Chasity Moore filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against First Transit, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00817

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chasity Moore

Defendants

First Transit, Inc.

Lorraine Lopez

Eric Reynolds

Does 1 through 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Valerie Consolacion Leones

2670 Myrtle Avenue, Suite 106

Monrovia, CA 91016

Michael T Carr

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael Carr APC

2670 South Myrtle Avenue Suite 106

Monrovia, CA 91016-5077

Roman Otkupman

Attorney at Otkupman Law Firm ALC

5743 Corsa Avenue Suite 123

Westlake Village, CA 91362

Defendant Attorneys

Julie R Campos

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

5200 North Palm Avenue Suite 302

Fresno, CA 93704

Ryan Lee Eddings

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

5200 North Palm Avenue Suite 302

Fresno, CA 93704

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Chasity Moore, re Reply (Motion related) #20 , Declaration (Motion related) #21 served on 06/13/2022. (Leones, Valerie) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#21

(#21) DECLARATION of Michael T. Carr in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #15 filed by Plaintiff Chasity Moore. (Leones, Valerie) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#20

(#20) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #15 filed by Plaintiff Chasity Moore. (Leones, Valerie) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#19

(#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant First Transit, Inc., re Declaration (Motion related) #18 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #17 served on 06/06/2022. (Campos, Julie) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#18

(#18) DECLARATION of Julie R. Campos in opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #15 filed by Defendant First Transit, Inc.. (Campos, Julie) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#17

(#17) Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #15 filed by Defendant First Transit, Inc.. (Campos, Julie) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

15 #2

Certificate of Service

15 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

15 #15

Main Document

#4

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant First Transit, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Declaration #4 , Declaration #5 served on 04/14/2022. (Campos, Julie) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#3

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant First Transit, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Declaration #4 , Declaration #5 served on 04/14/2022. (Campos, Julie) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#2

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant First Transit, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Declaration #4 , Declaration #5 served on 04/14/2022. (Campos, Julie) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #1

Main Document

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Chasity Moore, re Reply (Motion related) #20 , Declaration (Motion related) #21 served on 06/13/2022. (Leones, Valerie) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) DECLARATION of Michael T. Carr in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #15 filed by Plaintiff Chasity Moore. (Leones, Valerie) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #15 filed by Plaintiff Chasity Moore. (Leones, Valerie) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant First Transit, Inc., re Declaration (Motion related) #18 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #17 served on 06/06/2022. (Campos, Julie) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DECLARATION of Julie R. Campos in opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #15 filed by Defendant First Transit, Inc.. (Campos, Julie) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #15 filed by Defendant First Transit, Inc.. (Campos, Julie) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) [MEMORANDUM OF POINT AND AUTHORITIES, filed as] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Chasity Moore. Motion set for hearing on 6/27/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Leones, Valerie) Modified on 5/23/2022 (twdb). (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant First Transit, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #13 served on 04/25/2022. (Campos, Julie) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant First Transit, Inc., identifying First Transit Bidco, Inc.; First Transit Parent, Inc.; First Transit Intermediate Holding, LLC and EQT Infrastructure V Investments S.a.r.l.. (Campos, Julie) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (rolm) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (rolm) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED ANSWER to COMPLAINT filed by defendant First Transit, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT 1-2 AS EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](rolm) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, First Transit, Inc., Lorraine Lopez, Eric Reynolds. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Chasity Moore. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 02/24/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT 1-1 AS EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (rolm) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant First Transit, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Declaration #4 , Declaration #5 served on 04/14/2022. (Campos, Julie) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DECLARATION of Lorraine Lopez re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Declaration #4 filed by Defendant First Transit, Inc.. (Campos, Julie) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Julie R. Campos re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Defendant First Transit, Inc.. (Campos, Julie) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant First Transit, Inc. identifying First Transit, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Campos, Julie) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant First Transit, Inc.. (Campos, Julie) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superio Court, case number 30-2022-01247096-CU-WT-WJC Receipt No: ACACDC-33130673 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant First Transit, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Attorney Julie R Campos added to party First Transit, Inc.(pty:dft))(Campos, Julie) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST TRANSIT is a litigant