This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2023 at 08:11:00 (UTC).

Moore v. Experian et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 Moore filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul A. Engelmayer and Sarah L Cave. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00673

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Engelmayer

Referral Judge

Sarah L Cave

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERISA MOORE

Defendants

Experian

Equifax

TransUnion

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Justin Harris

Camille Renee Nicodemus

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER: On March 6, 2023, Defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union, LLC filed a motion to dismiss Plaintiff Erisa Moore's ("Ms. Moore") complaint, (ECF No. 13 (the "Motion")), with a response due on March 20, 2023. To date, Ms. Moore has not responded to the Motion. Accordingly, Ms. Moore shall respond to the Motion by Wednesday, March 29, 2023. Ms. Moore is warned that failure to respond to the Motion may result in the Court deeming the Motion unopposed and ruling on the Motion based on Defendants' submissions alone. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 3/29/2023) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 3/22/2023) (ama) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

#16

(#16) AMENDED ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Particular Motion: Dkt. 13. SO ORDERED. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. Motions referred to Sarah L Cave. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/06/2023) (ama) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

#15

(#15) AFFIDAVIT of Justin Harris Concerning Service in Support re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (ECF No. 1-1) by Defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc., and Trans Union, LLC.. Document filed by Experian..(Harris, Justin) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#14

(#14) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (ECF No. 1-1) by Defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc., and Trans Union, LLC. . Document filed by Experian..(Harris, Justin) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (ECF No. 1-1) by Defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc., and Trans Union, LLC. Document filed by Experian..(Harris, Justin) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#12

(#12) CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE. Document filed by Erisa Moore. (sc) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by TransUnion..(Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#10

(#10) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent Trans Union Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., for TransUnion. Document filed by TransUnion..(Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Camille Renee Nicodemus on behalf of TransUnion..(Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#7

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. dated Jan. 30, 2023., #1 Notice of Removal,. Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s ("Experian") first letter-motion seeking an extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint (ECF No. 7) is GRANTED, and Experian shall answer, move, or otherwise respond by Monday, March 6, 2023. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 7. SO ORDERED. (Experian answer due 3/6/2023.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 1/30/23) (yv) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin Harris on behalf of Experian..(Harris, Justin) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/27/2023) (ks) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-9654 (JMF). Document filed by Experian..(Harris, Justin) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Harris, Justin) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

1 #3

Exhibit C - Equifax Information Services, LLC's Consent to Removal

1 #2

Exhibit B - Trans Union, LLC's Consent to Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons with Endorsed Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER: On March 6, 2023, Defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union, LLC filed a motion to dismiss Plaintiff Erisa Moore's ("Ms. Moore") complaint, (ECF No. 13 (the "Motion")), with a response due on March 20, 2023. To date, Ms. Moore has not responded to the Motion. Accordingly, Ms. Moore shall respond to the Motion by Wednesday, March 29, 2023. Ms. Moore is warned that failure to respond to the Motion may result in the Court deeming the Motion unopposed and ruling on the Motion based on Defendants' submissions alone. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 3/29/2023) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 3/22/2023) (ama) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AMENDED ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Particular Motion: Dkt. 13. SO ORDERED. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. Motions referred to Sarah L Cave. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/06/2023) (ama) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AFFIDAVIT of Justin Harris Concerning Service in Support re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (ECF No. 1-1) by Defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc., and Trans Union, LLC.. Document filed by Experian..(Harris, Justin) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (ECF No. 1-1) by Defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc., and Trans Union, LLC. . Document filed by Experian..(Harris, Justin) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (ECF No. 1-1) by Defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc., and Trans Union, LLC. Document filed by Experian..(Harris, Justin) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE. Document filed by Erisa Moore. (sc) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by TransUnion..(Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent Trans Union Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., for TransUnion. Document filed by TransUnion..(Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Camille Renee Nicodemus on behalf of TransUnion..(Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. dated Jan. 30, 2023., #1 Notice of Removal,. Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s ("Experian") first letter-motion seeking an extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint (ECF No. 7) is GRANTED, and Experian shall answer, move, or otherwise respond by Monday, March 6, 2023. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 7. SO ORDERED. (Experian answer due 3/6/2023.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 1/30/23) (yv) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin Harris on behalf of Experian..(Harris, Justin) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/27/2023) (ks) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Justin Harris. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand (none). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $10,000. (sj) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Justin Harris. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ERISA MOORE. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-9654 (JMF). Document filed by Experian..(Harris, Justin) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Harris, Justin) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil Court of the City of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: CV-011482-22/BX. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27254640).Document filed by Experian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons with Endorsed Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Trans Union, LLC's Consent to Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Equifax Information Services, LLC's Consent to Removal).(Harris, Justin) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less