This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2022 at 06:12:05 (UTC).

Moore v. Davol, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 Moore filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Davol, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Edmund A. Sargus and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02621

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmund A. Sargus

Referral Judge

Kimberly A. Jolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Randolph Moore

Defendants

Davol, Inc.

C.R. Bard, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Ethicon Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olayiwola O. Oduyingbo

Attorney at ODU Law Firm, LLC

200 Midway Road, Suite 200, P.O. Box 20672

Cranston, RI 02920

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1760625 ), filed by Randolph Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oduyingbo, Olayiwola) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 05/20/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#3

(#3) Conditional Transfer Order # CTO -88 Transferring this matter to the Southern District of Ohio and assignment to the Honorable Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 6/24/2022. (DaCruz, Kayla) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of Rhode Island; Case Number 1:22-cv-00202. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/27/2022)

4 #1

*Restricted*

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketJudge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson added. (daf) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Case transferred in from District of Rhode Island; Case Number 1:22-cv-00202. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Conditional Transfer Order # CTO -88 Transferring this matter to the Southern District of Ohio and assignment to the Honorable Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 6/24/2022. (DaCruz, Kayla) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (DaCruz, Kayla) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1760625 ), filed by Randolph Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oduyingbo, Olayiwola) [Transferred from Rhode Island on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Davol, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant