This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2021 at 08:33:28 (UTC).

Moore v. CCSI, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 Moore filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against CCSI, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kristi H. Johnson and Michael T. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00521

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristi H. Johnson

Referral Judge

Michael T. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Octzavius Moore

Defendants

CCSI, Inc.

Cissye Carthan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joel F. Dillard

Attorney at JOEL F. DILLARD, PA

775 North Congress Street

Jackson, MS 39202

Philip Bohrer - PHV

Attorney at BOHRER BRADY, LLC

8712 Jefferson Highway, Suite B

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Scott E. Brady - PHV

Attorney at BOHRER BRADY, LLC

8712 Jefferson Highway, Suite B

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Jay Kucia

Attorney at JOEL F. DILLARD, PA

775 North Congress Street

Jackson, MS 39202

Defendant Attorney

Derek D. Hopson, Sr,

Attorney at HOPSON LAW GROUP

Post Office Box 266, 601 Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr

Clarksdale, MS 38614

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

Exhibit 1: Certificates

5 #5

Main Document

4 #1

Exhibit 1: Certificates

4 #4

Main Document

#3

#2

1 #2

Cover Letter

1 #1

Exhibit A- Plaintiff's authorization

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketRule 16(a) Order and NEF of Reset Hearings event docketed 9/29/21 mailed to Jay Kucia (KPM) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Kucia on behalf of Octzavius Moore (Kucia, Jay) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketReset Hearings: Telephonic Case Management Conference reset for 10/28/2021 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 10/22/21. PLEASE NOTE: ONLY THE TIME HAS CHANGED. (KPM) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 10/22/21. (KPM) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER denying #11 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. This motion lacks a memorandum brief in support of the motion as required by L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(4). No further written order to follow. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 9/15/21. (KJ) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Dismiss ALTERNATIVELY, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER by CCSI, Inc., Cissye Carthan (Hopson, Derek) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to #10 . This document requests motion relief. Motion relief should be selected from the list of motion titles. Attorney is advised to also file using the Motion to Dismiss event and use the same PDF document for filing the Motion to Dismiss. (ND) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CCSI, Inc., Cissye Carthan.(Hopson, Derek) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Octzavius Moore. Cissye Carthan served on 8/21/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (Bohrer - PHV, Philip) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Filing Consent Form by Octzavius Moore (Bohrer - PHV, Philip) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Octzavius Moore. CCSI, Inc. served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021. (Bohrer - PHV, Philip) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing Consent Form by Octzavius Moore (Bohrer - PHV, Philip) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Scott E. Brady and Philip Bohrer are hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on August 24, 2021 (KPM) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Philip Bohrer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4641070) by Octzavius Moore (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Certificates)(Dillard, Joel) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Scott E. Brady to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4641058) by Octzavius Moore (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Certificates)(Dillard, Joel) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by Octzavius Moore (Dillard, Joel) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to CCSI, Inc., Cissye Carthan. (LAT) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against CCSI, Inc., Cissye Carthan ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-4631629), filed by Octzavius Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Plaintiff's authorization, #2 Cover Letter)(LAT) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Derek D. Hopson