This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/04/2021 at 08:24:46 (UTC).

Moore v. Boston Private Financial Holdings, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 Moore filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Boston Private Financial Holdings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise L. Cote. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01939

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise L. Cote

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tremaine Moore

Defendants

Anthony Dechellis

Luis A. Ubinas

Gloria C. Larson

Stephen M. Waters

Lizabeth H. Zlatkus

Mark F. Furlong

Deborah F. Kuenstner

Kimberly S. Stevenson

Joseph C. Guyaux

Boston Private Financial Holdings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua M. Lifshitz

Attorney at Lifshitz Law Firm, P.C.

1190 Broadway

Hewlett, NY 11557

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, the initial pretrial conference will be held telephonically. Prior to the date of the conference, counsel for all parties shall register as filing users in accordance with the Procedures for Electronic Case Filing, and as further set forth in this order. Initial Conference set for 5/7/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote. The parties shall use the following dial-in credentials for the conference. Dial-in: 888-363-4749 Access code: 4324948 The parties shall use a landline if one is available. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/10/2021) (jwh) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-01480-DLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Denise L. Cote as possibly related to 1:21-cv-1480 (DLC). (gp) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (gp) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(gp) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21cv01480. Document filed by Tremaine Moore..(Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Boston Private Financial Holdings, Inc., Anthony Dechellis, Mark F. Furlong, Joseph C. Guyaux, Deborah F. Kuenstner, Gloria C. Larson, Kimberly S. Stevenson, Luis A. Ubinas, Stephen M. Waters, Lizabeth H. Zlatkus. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24211965)Document filed by Tremaine Moore..(Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boston Private Financial Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua M. Lifshitz