This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2021 at 09:45:16 (UTC).

Moore v. Best Buy Stores, L.P.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Moore filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Best Buy Stores, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Terry R Means. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00375

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry R Means

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jalen Moore

Defendant

Best Buy Stores, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bradley Adam Drawhorn

Attorney at Stephens Anderson & Cummings LLP

4200 West Vickery Blvd

Fort Worth, TX 76107

John M Cummings

Attorney at Stephens, Anderson & Cummings LLP

4200 West Vickery Blvd

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Seth Marshall Anderson

Attorney at Stephens & Anderson

4200 W Vickery Blvd

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Defendant Attorneys

Donna C Peavler

Attorney at The Peavler Group

2215 Westgate Plaza

Grapevine, TX 76051

Sara Kimbrough Scudday

Attorney at Peavler|Briscoe

2215 Westgate Plaza

Grapevine, TX 76051

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN: The parties are ordered to electronically file with the clerk of the court the signed joint status report and proposed discovery plan (one instrument) within 28 days of the date of the filing of this order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 4/9/2021) (bdb) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Best Buy Stores, L.P.. (Peavler, Donna) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Best Buy Stores, L.P.. (Peavler, Donna) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

1 #4

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #3

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

1 #1

Additional Page(s)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Best Buy Stores, L.P.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11634801) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Peavler, Donna) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN: The parties are ordered to electronically file with the clerk of the court the signed joint status report and proposed discovery plan (one instrument) within 28 days of the date of the filing of this order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 4/9/2021) (bdb) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Best Buy Stores, L.P.. (Peavler, Donna) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Best Buy Stores, L.P.. (Peavler, Donna) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Best Buy Stores, L.P.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11634801) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Peavler, Donna) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEST BUY STORES L.P. A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seth Marshall Anderson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John M Cummings