This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:34:28 (UTC).

Moore v. Berryhill

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Moore filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Berryhill. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Theresa Carroll Buchanan and Leonie M. Brinkema. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00200

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Theresa Carroll Buchanan

Presiding Judge

Leonie M. Brinkema

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shon R Moore

Defendants

Nancy Berryhill

Nancy A. Berryhill

Interested Party

SSA (Social Security Administration)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edwin Frederick Brooks

Attorney at Law Office of Edwin F Brooks

6 W Broad St

Richmond, VA 23220

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/21/19. (klau, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Proposed Summons for Nancy Berryhill by Shon R Moore. (Brooks, Edwin) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney by Shon R Moore. (Brooks, Edwin) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Proposed Summons Acting Attorney General by Shon R Moore. (Brooks, Edwin) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction re #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, The filing user has been notified that document is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (klau, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/21/19. (klau, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Document filed in error and removed re Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney by Shon R Moore. (Brooks, Edwin) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/22/2019) (klau, ). Modified text on 2/22/2019 (klau, ). (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Document filed in error and removed re Proposed Summons Acting Attorney General by Shon R Moore. (Brooks, Edwin) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/22/2019) (klau, ). Modified text on 2/22/2019 (klau, ). (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Document filed in error and removed re Proposed Summons for Nancy Berryhill by Shon R Moore. (Brooks, Edwin) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/22/2019) (klau, ). Modified text on 2/22/2019 (klau, ). (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Meredith E. Marcus and Certification of Local Counsel Edwin F. Brooks Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6502175. by Shon R Moore. (Brooks, Edwin) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6502159.), filed by Shon R Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brooks, Edwin) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.