This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/20/2022 at 08:01:02 (UTC).

Moore v. Bechaz et al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 Moore filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Bechaz. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Nannette Jolivette Brown and Dana Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03386

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nannette Jolivette Brown

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sheronda Moore

Defendants

Timothy Bechaz

Greenwich Insurance Company

Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jon Michael Yeager

Attorney at Yeager LaNasa Tauzier LLC

2700 Athania Parkway

Metairie, LA 70002

Anthony Vincent LaNasa

Attorney at Yeager LaNasa Tauzier LLC

2700 Athania Parkway

Metairie, LA 70002

Mark G. Tauzier

Attorney at Yeager LaNasa Tauzier LLC

2700 Athania Parkway

Metairie, LA 70002

Melissa Myhanh Ha

Attorney at Yeager LaNasa Tauzier LLC

2700 Athania Parkway

Metairie, LA 70002

Michael Kevin Melucci

Attorney at Yeager LaNasa Tauzier LLC

2700 Athania Parkway

Metairie, LA 70002

Defendant Attorneys

Robin Bryan Cheatham

Attorney at Adams & Reese, LLP (New Orleans)

701 Poydras St., Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70139

William Kirby Wright, IV

Attorney at Adams & Reese, LLP (New Orleans)

701 Poydras St., Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit "1"

1 #2

Exhibit "2"

1 #3

Exhibit "3"

1 #4

Exhibit "4"

1 #5

Exhibit "5"

1 #6

Exhibit "6"

1 #7

Exhibit "7"

1 #8

Exhibit "8"

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Wright, William) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#4

(#4) DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC, Greenwich Insurance Company, Timothy Bechaz. (cs) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 9/22/2022.(caa) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice of Compliance by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC, Timothy Bechaz, Greenwich Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Wright, William) Modified link/text on 10/4/2022 (cs). (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/12/2022 02:00 PM before case manager by telephone. Call-in instructions provided herein. Issued by Clerk. (mp) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 8/18/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/4/2023 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Jury Trial set for 10/23/2023 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form, #2 Standing Order)(mp) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

9 #1

Pretrial Notice Form

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 8/18/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/4/2023 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Jury Trial set for 10/23/2023 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form, #2 Standing Order)(mp) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/12/2022 02:00 PM before case manager by telephone. Call-in instructions provided herein. Issued by Clerk. (mp) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Notice of Compliance. Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to document 4. Clerk properly linked document to document 1. (cs) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Compliance by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC, Timothy Bechaz, Greenwich Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Wright, William) Modified link/text on 10/4/2022 (cs). (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 9/22/2022.(caa) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC, Greenwich Insurance Company, Timothy Bechaz. (cs) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Wright, William) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st Judicial District Court, Tangipahoa Parish, case number 2021-0002662 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9564270) filed by Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC, Greenwich Insurance Company, Timothy Bechaz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)Attorney William Kirby Wright, IV added to party Asplundh Tree Expert, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney William Kirby Wright, IV added to party Timothy Bechaz(pty:dft), Attorney William Kirby Wright, IV added to party Greenwich Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Wright, William) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/21/2022) (jls). Modified text on 9/22/2022 (cs). (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GREENWICH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robin B Cheatham

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Kirby Wright, IV