This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/12/2021 at 11:56:28 (UTC).

Moore et al v. Shanahan Engineering, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Moore filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Shanahan Engineering, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn N Hughes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-03873

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn N Hughes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Peter Moore

Stephen Scheithauer

Defendant

Shanahan Engineering, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard J Burch

Attorney at Bruckner Burch PLLC

8 Greenway Plaza, Ste 1500

Houston, TX 77046

Andrew Wells Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Ste 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Michael A Josephson

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Ste 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Defendant Attorneys

Samuel Zurik, III

Attorney at Kullman Firm

1100 Poydras St, 1600 Energy Centre

New Orleans, LA 70163

Robert P Lombardi

Attorney at The Kullman Firm

1100 Poydras St, Ste 1600

New Orleans, LA 70163

Bryan Edward Bowdler

Attorney at The Kullman Firm PLC

1100 Poydras St, Ste 1600

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

11 #1

Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff Stephen Scheithauer's Rhode Island Minimum Wage Act Claim as Asserted on Behalf of Others by Shanahan Engineering, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zurik, Samuel) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Robert P. Lombardi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shanahan Engineering, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/6/2021. (Lombardi, Robert) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Bryan Edward Bowdler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shanahan Engineering, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/6/2021. (Bowdler, Bryan) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Shanahan Engineering, Inc. served on 11/23/2020, answer due 12/14/2020, filed.(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Shanahan Engineering, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Shanahan Engineering, Inc., filed.(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Peter Moore, Stephen Scheithauer, filed.(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Peter Moore, Stephen Scheithauer, filed. (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Josephson on behalf of Peter Moore, Stephen Scheithauer, filed. (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 2/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Shanahan Engineering, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25509948) filed by Peter Moore, Stephen Scheithauer.(Burch, Richard) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan E. Bowdler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel Zurik, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert P. Lombardi