This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2020 at 11:25:20 (UTC).

Moore, Cherrie v. Husky Energy, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 Moore, Cherrie filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Husky Energy, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00632

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cherrie D. Moore

Defendants

Superior Refining Company LLC

Husky Energy, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Heath P. Straka

Attorney at Axley Brynelson, LLP

2 E. Mifflin Street., Ste. 200, P.O. Box 1767

Madison, WI 53701-1767

Garrett Matthew Gondik

Attorney at Richard S. Gondik, Jr., S.C.

1215 Belknap Street

Superior, WI 54880

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Garrett Matthew Gondik for Plaintiff Cherrie D. Moore. (Gondik, Garrett) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

2 #1

Summons Superior Refining Company

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Husky Energy, Inc. and Superior Refining Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Superior Refining Company) (voc) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

1 #3

Summons -Superior Refining Company

1 #2

Summons -Husky Energy

1 #1

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2710558.), filed by Cherrie D. Moore. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons -Husky Energy, #3 Summons -Superior Refining Company) (Straka, Heath) Modified on 7/9/2020: Changed county from Dane to Douglas. (lak) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Garrett Matthew Gondik for Plaintiff Cherrie D. Moore. (Gondik, Garrett) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Husky Energy, Inc. and Superior Refining Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Superior Refining Company) (voc) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketStandard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCase non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Related to 18-cv-00697, 19-cv-00462, 18-cv-00917 and 20-cv-631. (voc) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2710558.), filed by Cherrie D. Moore. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons -Husky Energy, #3 Summons -Superior Refining Company) (Straka, Heath) Modified on 7/9/2020: Changed county from Dane to Douglas. (lak) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Husky Energy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Refining Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heath P. Straka