This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:46:13 (UTC).

MOORE

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 MOORE was filed as a Not Yet Classified lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-MC-00113

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

 

Party Details

In Re

JIMMIE MOORE

Philadelphia, PA 19121

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER THAT RESPONDENT IS PLACED ON TEMPORARY SUSPENSION FROM THE PRACTICE OF LAW IN THIS COURT, EFFECTIVE THIRTY DAYS FROM MAY 13, 2019, AND UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 07/12/19. 07/12/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (go,) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#3

(#3) Letter dated June 17, 2019, from Jimmie Moore, notifying the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania that the Supreme Court has suspended his license to practice law, based on the joint petition for temporary suspension filed with Pennsylvania Supreme Court. Pennsylvania Supreme Court Order attached. (go,) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER THAT THE RESPONDENT FILE WITH THIS COURT, WITHIN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF SERVICE OF THIS ORDER, AN ANSWER INFORMING THIS COURT OF ANY CLAIM BY THE RESPONDENT, PREDICATED UPON THE GROUNDS SET FORTH IN L.R.C.P. 83.6 11 D, THAT THE IMPOSITION OF IDENTICAL DISCIPLINE BY THIS COURT WOULD BE UNWARRANTED, AND THE REASONS THEREFORE. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 05/20/19. 05/20/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (go,) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#1

(#1) Copy of Order from the Supreme Court of Pennsylvania dated May 13, 2019, upon consideration of the Joint Petition for Temporary Suspension, Jimmie Moore is placed on temporary suspension, see Pa.R.D.E. 214(d)(5), and he shall comply with all the provisions of Pa.R.D.E. 217. Respondents right to petition for dissolution or amendment of this Order and to request accelerated disposition of charges underlying this Order pursuant to Pa.R.D.E. 214(f)(2) are specifically preserved. (go,) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/17/2019) (go, ). (Entered: 05/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER THAT RESPONDENT IS PLACED ON TEMPORARY SUSPENSION FROM THE PRACTICE OF LAW IN THIS COURT, EFFECTIVE THIRTY DAYS FROM MAY 13, 2019, AND UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 07/12/19. 07/12/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (go,) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter dated June 17, 2019, from Jimmie Moore, notifying the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania that the Supreme Court has suspended his license to practice law, based on the joint petition for temporary suspension filed with Pennsylvania Supreme Court. Pennsylvania Supreme Court Order attached. (go,) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER THAT THE RESPONDENT FILE WITH THIS COURT, WITHIN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF SERVICE OF THIS ORDER, AN ANSWER INFORMING THIS COURT OF ANY CLAIM BY THE RESPONDENT, PREDICATED UPON THE GROUNDS SET FORTH IN L.R.C.P. 83.6 11 D, THAT THE IMPOSITION OF IDENTICAL DISCIPLINE BY THIS COURT WOULD BE UNWARRANTED, AND THE REASONS THEREFORE. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 05/20/19. 05/20/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (go,) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Copy of Order from the Supreme Court of Pennsylvania dated May 13, 2019, upon consideration of the Joint Petition for Temporary Suspension, Jimmie Moore is placed on temporary suspension, see Pa.R.D.E. 214(d)(5), and he shall comply with all the provisions of Pa.R.D.E. 217. Respondents right to petition for dissolution or amendment of this Order and to request accelerated disposition of charges underlying this Order pursuant to Pa.R.D.E. 214(f)(2) are specifically preserved. (go,) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/17/2019) (go, ). (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.