This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/30/2020 at 12:54:38 (UTC).

Mooney v. Roller Bearing Company of America Inc

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 Mooney filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Roller Bearing Company of America Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marsha J. Pechman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01030

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marsha J. Pechman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Mooney

Defendants

Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc.

Roller Bearing Company of America Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick J Kang

Attorney at PREMIER LAW GROUP

1408 140Th Place Ne

Bellevue, WA 98007

Kristina Ohlinger

Attorney at PREMIER LAW GROUP

1408 140Th Place Ne

Bellevue, WA 98007

Defendant Attorneys

Blake Edward Marks-Dias

Attorney at CORR CRONIN, LLP

1001 4Th Ave, Ste 3900

Seattle, WA 98154-1051

Victoria Ainsworth

Attorney at CORR CRONIN, LLP

1001 4Th Ave, Ste 3900

Seattle, WA 98154-1051

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/31/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/8/2020. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint; by Roller Bearing Company of America Inc.(Marks-Dias, Blake) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristina Ohlinger on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Mooney. (Ohlinger, Kristina) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#6

(#6) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Richard Mooney (Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)ad hoc Attorney Ohlinger (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#4

(#4) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent RBC Bearings Incorporated, Other Affiliate Heim Bearing Company for Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc. (Marks-Dias, Blake) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Marks-Dias, Blake) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

1 #2

Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-09558-3-KNT; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6437902), filed by Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Marks-Dias, Blake) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/31/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/8/2020. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint; by Roller Bearing Company of America Inc.(Marks-Dias, Blake) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristina Ohlinger on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Mooney. (Ohlinger, Kristina) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Richard Mooney (Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)ad hoc Attorney Ohlinger (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketJudge Marsha J. Pechman added. (CDA) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent RBC Bearings Incorporated, Other Affiliate Heim Bearing Company for Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc. (Marks-Dias, Blake) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Marks-Dias, Blake) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-09558-3-KNT; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6437902), filed by Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Marks-Dias, Blake) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROLLER BEARING COMPANY OF AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick J Kang