This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/04/2020 at 10:52:39 (UTC).

Moon v. Mississippi Double Quick Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 Moon filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Mississippi Double Quick Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian S. Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00140

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frances Virginia Moon

Defendants

John Does

Double Quick Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael D. Ray

Attorney at The Ray Law Firm, P.A.

Post Office Box 1123

Crossett, AR 71635

Defendant Attorney

James D. Robertson

Attorney at Barber Law Firm PLLC

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 3400

Little Rock, AR 72201

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Frances Virginia Moon (Ray, Michael) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Double Quick Inc (Robertson, James) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/14/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/28/2020; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 12/13/2021 at 09:30 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 07/10/2020. (rmg) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Double Quick Inc.(kdr) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Frances Virginia Moon.(kdr) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Double Quick Inc from Chicot County Circuit Court, case number 09CV-20-53-3. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT077917. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael D. Ray