This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/19/2022 at 07:26:39 (UTC).

Moon et al v. American General Life Insurance Co et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2022 Moon filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American General Life Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph F Anderson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-01284

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F Anderson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Beverly Moon

Betty R Jenkins

Defendants

American General Life Insurance Co

American International Group Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles B Burnette, III

Attorney at Burnette & Payne, PA

414 E. Main Street

Rock Hill, SC 29730

Charles Baxter Burnette, IV

Attorney at Burnette and Payne (SC)

414 E Main Street

Rock Hill, SC 29730

Defendant Attorneys

Don Lawrence Kristinik, III

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough

Po Box 11070

Columbia, SC 29211

Kelly Lynn Taylor

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough LLP (Cola)

Meridian Building, 17Th Floor

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) SCHEDULING ORDER and SPECIAL NOTICE TO COUNSEL WITH CASES BEFORE JUDGE JOSEPH F. ANDERSON, JR. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/15/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/17/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/16/2022, Discovery due by 2/27/2023, Motions due by 3/20/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 7/11/2023, Mediation Due by 10/10/2022. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 5/31/22. (mflo, ) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#20

(#20) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Beverly Moon. American General Life Insurance Co served on 5/23/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Burnette, Charles) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#18

(#18) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by American International Group Inc. (Taylor, Kelly) Modified on 5/23/2022 to delete party from entry(mflo, ). (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#17

(#17) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Beverly Moon.(Burnette, Charles) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Baxter Burnette, IV on behalf of Beverly Moon (Burnette, Charles) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#13

(#13) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Beverly Moon. (Burnette, Charles) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#11

(#11) RESCHEDULED ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Conference set for Tuesday, May 31, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. in chambers of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. Matters to be taken up at the conference will include all those items identified in Rule 16(a) and (c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The attorneys of record shall conduct a conference pursuant to Rule 26(f) no later than 14 days prior to the date of the Rule 16 Conference. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 5/3/22. (mflo, ) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Conference set for Thursday, May 19, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. in chambers of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. Matters to be taken up at the conference will include all those items identified in Rule 16(a) and (c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The attorneys of record shall conduct a conference pursuant to Rule 26(f) no later than 14 days prior to the date of the Rule 16 Conference. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 4/28/22. (mflo, ) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B Burnette, III on behalf of Betty R Jenkins, Beverly Moon (Burnette, Charles) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

8 #1

Certificate of Service

8 #8

Main Document

7 #1

Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of Filing of Removal

7 #7

Main Document

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by American General Life Insurance Co, American International Group Inc. (mflo, ) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American International Group Inc.(mflo, ) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#2

(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American General Life Insurance Co.(mflo, ) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

1 #1

State Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) SCHEDULING ORDER and SPECIAL NOTICE TO COUNSEL WITH CASES BEFORE JUDGE JOSEPH F. ANDERSON, JR. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/15/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/17/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/16/2022, Discovery due by 2/27/2023, Motions due by 3/20/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 7/11/2023, Mediation Due by 10/10/2022. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 5/31/22. (mflo, ) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • Docket(#22) Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr: Rule 16 Conference held on 5/31/2022, court to file scheduling order. Court Reporter not present. (mflo, ) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING Rule 16 Conference set for Tuesday, May 31, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. in chambers cancelled and rescheduled to: **CHANGE IN TIME ONLY** Rule 16 Conference set for 5/31/2022 03:00 PM in chambers before Honorable Joseph F Anderson Jr. (mflo, ) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Beverly Moon. American General Life Insurance Co served on 5/23/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Burnette, Charles) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by American International Group Inc. (Taylor, Kelly) Modified on 5/23/2022 to delete party from entry(mflo, ). (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Beverly Moon.(Burnette, Charles) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Baxter Burnette, IV on behalf of Beverly Moon (Burnette, Charles) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 12 Reason: corrected document refiled by attorney Corrected Filing Document Number #13 (mflo, ) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Beverly Moon. (Burnette, Charles) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESCHEDULED ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Conference set for Tuesday, May 31, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. in chambers of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. Matters to be taken up at the conference will include all those items identified in Rule 16(a) and (c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The attorneys of record shall conduct a conference pursuant to Rule 26(f) no later than 14 days prior to the date of the Rule 16 Conference. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 5/3/22. (mflo, ) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Conference set for Thursday, May 19, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. in chambers of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. Matters to be taken up at the conference will include all those items identified in Rule 16(a) and (c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The attorneys of record shall conduct a conference pursuant to Rule 26(f) no later than 14 days prior to the date of the Rule 16 Conference. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on 4/28/22. (mflo, ) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B Burnette, III on behalf of Betty R Jenkins, Beverly Moon (Burnette, Charles) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American General Life Insurance Co, American International Group Inc re #7 Notice and Acknowledgment of Removal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Taylor, Kelly) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for York County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of Filing of Removal)(Taylor, Kelly) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by American General Life Insurance Co, American International Group Inc. (mflo, ) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American International Group Inc.(mflo, ) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American General Life Insurance Co.(mflo, ) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10453508), filed by American General Life Insurance Co, American International Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(mflo, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2022: #2 Certificate of Service) (mflo, ). (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American International Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where American General Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Don Lawrence Kristinik, III