This case was last updated from PACER on 10/25/2019 at 07:32:11 (UTC).

Moody v. Ramey et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2019 a Prisoner - Prison Condition case was filed by Moody against Ramey in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00236

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Jerome T. Kearney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michal A Moody

Defendants

Steve Rorex

Doyle Ramey

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Michal A Moody re #5 Order. (fjg) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#8

(#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michael A Moody re 1983 Complaint form. (jak) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#7

(#7) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Michal A Moody re #6 Initial Order for Pro Se Prisoners. (fjg) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#6

(#6) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 09/16/2019. (lmc) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350 for this action. Plaintiff's custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from his prison trust account and forward them to the Clerk until a total of $350 has been collected. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order. The Clerk shall mail plaintiff the 1983 complaint form. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Poinsett County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/16/2019. (jak) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michal A Moody. (kdr) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER directing Plaintiff Moody to submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or an in forma pauperis motion, within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send to Plaintiff an In Forma Pauperis Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/29/2019. (jak) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Inmate Account by Michal A Moody. (llg) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Michal A Moody. (llg) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Michal A Moody re #5 Order. (fjg) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michael A Moody re 1983 Complaint form. (jak) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Michal A Moody re #6 Initial Order for Pro Se Prisoners. (fjg) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 09/16/2019. (lmc) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350 for this action. Plaintiff's custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from his prison trust account and forward them to the Clerk until a total of $350 has been collected. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order. The Clerk shall mail plaintiff the 1983 complaint form. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Poinsett County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/16/2019. (jak) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michal A Moody. (kdr) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER directing Plaintiff Moody to submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or an in forma pauperis motion, within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send to Plaintiff an In Forma Pauperis Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/29/2019. (jak) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Inmate Account by Michal A Moody. (llg) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Michal A Moody. (llg) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.