This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2020 at 07:47:30 (UTC).

MOODY v. MEDTRONIC, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 MOODY filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against MEDTRONIC, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are CATHERINE C. EAGLES and JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01216

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CATHERINE C. EAGLES

Referral Judge

JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JIMMY L. MOODY

Defendants

MEDTRONIC, INC.

MEDTRONIC USA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT O. JENKINS

Attorney at LANIER LAW GROUP, P.A.

600 S. Duke St.

Durham, NC 27701

Defendant Attorneys

CHRISTOPHER W. JACKSON

Attorney at ELLIS & WINTERS, LLP

Pob 2752

Greensboro, NC 27402

LESLIE C. PACKER

Attorney at ELLIS & WINTERS, LLP

Pob 33550

Raleigh, NC 27636

ELIZABETH E. TOBIN

Attorney at SHOOK, HARDY & BACON, LLP

2555 Grand Blvd.

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

BRYAN T. PRATT

Attorney at SHOOK, HARDY & BACON, LLP

2555 Grand Blvd.

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#18

(#18) MOTION to Amend #2 Complaint Plaintiff's Motion in the Alternative to Amend Complaint by JIMMY L. MOODY. Response to Motion due by 2/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(JENKINS, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#17

(#17) MEMORANDUM re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand by Plaintiff JIMMY L. MOODY. (JENKINS, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Remand to State Court by JIMMY L. MOODY. Response to Motion due by 2/21/2020 (JENKINS, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#15

(#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC. Memorandum in Opposition of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by JIMMY L. MOODY. Replies due by 2/14/2020 (JENKINS, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#14

(#14) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JIMMY L. MOODY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(JENKINS, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#11

(#11) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC.. Response to Motion due by 1/10/2020 (JACKSON, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE to State Court of Filing Petition for Removal by Defendants MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(JACKSON, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

4 #1

Consent Form

#4

(#4) Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

3 #1

Summons - Medtronic USA, Inc.

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to MEDTRONIC, INC., MEDTRONIC USA, INC., (Original documents filed in Alamance County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS2389, issued 11/8/2019 and listed as Exhibits B and C to the Petition for Removal) (Attachments: #1 Summons - Medtronic USA, Inc.) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#2

(#18) MOTION to Amend #2 Complaint Plaintiff's Motion in the Alternative to Amend Complaint by JIMMY L. MOODY. Response to Motion due by 2/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(JENKINS, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C - Summons Medtronic USA, Inc.

1 #2

Exhibit B - Summons Medtronic, Inc.

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL against JIMMY L. MOODY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2714710), filed by MEDTRONIC, INC., MEDTRONIC USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons Medtronic, Inc., #3 Exhibit C - Summons Medtronic USA, Inc.) (JACKSON, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Amend #2 Complaint Plaintiff's Motion in the Alternative to Amend Complaint by JIMMY L. MOODY. Response to Motion due by 2/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(JENKINS, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEMORANDUM re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand by Plaintiff JIMMY L. MOODY. (JENKINS, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Remand to State Court by JIMMY L. MOODY. Response to Motion due by 2/21/2020 (JENKINS, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC. Memorandum in Opposition of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by JIMMY L. MOODY. Replies due by 2/14/2020 (JENKINS, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER issued by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 1/13/20: GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File and extending the time to file brief in opposition to 1/31/2020. (Sanders, Marlene) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Submitted: #14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JIMMY L. MOODY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(JENKINS, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT O. JENKINS on behalf of Plaintiff JIMMY L. MOODY (JENKINS, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC. re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC.. (JACKSON, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC.. Response to Motion due by 1/10/2020 (JACKSON, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BRYAN T. PRATT on behalf of Defendants MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC. (PRATT, BRYAN) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LESLIE C. PACKER on behalf of Defendants MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC. (PACKER, LESLIE) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Medtronic plc for MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC... (JACKSON, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE to State Court of Filing Petition for Removal by Defendants MEDTRONIC USA, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(JACKSON, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to MEDTRONIC, INC., MEDTRONIC USA, INC., (Original documents filed in Alamance County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS2389, issued 11/8/2019 and listed as Exhibits B and C to the Petition for Removal) (Attachments: #1 Summons - Medtronic USA, Inc.) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against MEDTRONIC, INC., MEDTRONIC USA, INC., filed by JIMMY L. MOODY. (Original document filed in Alamance County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS2389 and listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL against JIMMY L. MOODY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2714710), filed by MEDTRONIC, INC., MEDTRONIC USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons Medtronic, Inc., #3 Exhibit C - Summons Medtronic USA, Inc.) (JACKSON, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less