This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/04/2019 at 07:33:40 (UTC).

Monzalvo v. Batterbee Roofing, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/05/2019 Monzalvo filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Batterbee Roofing, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip R. Lammens and James S. Moody, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00277

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Philip R. Lammens

Presiding Judge

James S. Moody, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Felix Monzalvo

Ivan Pavon

Marcial Perez

Defendant

Batterbee Roofing, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Noah E. Storch

Attorney at Richard Celler Legal, P.A.

10368 W Sr 84 , Suite 103

Davie, FL 33324

Defendant Attorney

Theresa M. Waugh

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

111 N Magnolia Ave Ste 1250

Orlando, FL 32801-2366

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • Set/reset deadlines/hearings: for All Defendants. Answer due by 8/7/2019. (HAI) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Collective Action Complaint. Defendant's answer or response is due by August 7, 2019. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/2/2019. (SMB) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to Plaintiff's complaint by Batterbee Roofing, Inc.. (Waugh, Theresa) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN of service executed on June 17, 2019 by Felix Monzalvo as to Batterbee Roofing, Inc.. (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS issued as to Batterbee Roofing, Inc.. (LAB) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of consent to join by Felix Monzalvo of Opt-in Plaintiff Ivan Pavon. (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of consent to join by Felix Monzalvo of Opt-in Plaintiff Marcial Perez. (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:19-cv-277-Oca-30PRL. (SJB) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Batterbee Roofing, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15544347) filed by Felix Monzalvo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Storch, Noah) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BATTERBEE ROOFING INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noah E. Storch