6:22-CV-00982
09/19/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Intellectual Property - Patent
Alan D Albright
Monument Peak Ventures, LLC
Alarm.com Incorporated
Jennifer Tatum Lee
John M. Shumaker
Cabrach J. Connor
John M. Jackson
Main Document
Exhibit A
Exhibit B
Exhibit C
Exhibit D
Exhibit E
Civil Cover Sheet
(#2) NOTICE of Related Case by Monument Peak Ventures, LLC (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
(#6) Summons Issued as to Alarm.com Incorporated. (lad) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
(#7) NOTICE Joint Notice Regarding Agreement to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Alarm.com Incorporated (Jackson, John) (Entered: 10/10/2022)
Main Document
Proposed Order
DocketCase Stayed (lad) (Entered: 11/17/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Stay. Noting that the motion is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. The case is hereby stayed for thirty (30) days. If the case is not dismissed within thirty days, the parties must submit a status report to the Court. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (EKlc) (Entered: 11/17/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) Unopposed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines by Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 11/16/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketReset Deadlines: Alarm.com Incorporated answer due 11/11/2022. (lad) (Entered: 10/11/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) NOTICE Joint Notice Regarding Agreement to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Alarm.com Incorporated (Jackson, John) (Entered: 10/10/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) Summons Issued as to Alarm.com Incorporated. (lad) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketParties shall comply with Judge Albright's standing orders at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/.The following orders were updated on 9/16/22:1. Standing Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases,2. Amended Standing Order On Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases.(lad) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) NOTICE of Related Case by Monument Peak Ventures, LLC (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16541410). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
[-] Read Less