This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/18/2022 at 09:09:46 (UTC).

Monument Peak Ventures, LLC v. Alarm.com Incorporated

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 Monument Peak Ventures, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Alarm com Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00982

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Monument Peak Ventures, LLC

Defendant

Alarm.com Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer Tatum Lee

John M. Shumaker

Cabrach J. Connor

Defendant Attorney

John M. Jackson

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Related Case by Monument Peak Ventures, LLC (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Alarm.com Incorporated. (lad) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE Joint Notice Regarding Agreement to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Alarm.com Incorporated (Jackson, John) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Proposed Order

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/17/2022

DocketCase Stayed (lad) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2022
View Court Documents

DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Stay. Noting that the motion is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. The case is hereby stayed for thirty (30) days. If the case is not dismissed within thirty days, the parties must submit a status report to the Court. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (EKlc) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines by Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2022

DocketReset Deadlines: Alarm.com Incorporated answer due 11/11/2022. (lad) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE Joint Notice Regarding Agreement to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Alarm.com Incorporated (Jackson, John) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Alarm.com Incorporated. (lad) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022

DocketParties shall comply with Judge Albright's standing orders at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/.The following orders were updated on 9/16/22:1. Standing Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases,2. Amended Standing Order On Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases.(lad) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2022

DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE of Related Case by Monument Peak Ventures, LLC (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16541410). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less