This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:46:04 (UTC).

Montoya v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Montoya filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Home Depot U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laura Fashing and James O. Browning. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01137

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Laura Fashing

Presiding Judge

James O. Browning

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Louis Montoya

Defendant

Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Douglas E Gardner

Attorney at Robles Rael & Anaya PC

500 Marquette Nw, Suite 700

Albuquerque, NM 87114

Samuel C. DeFillippo

Attorney at Robles, Rael and Anaya, P.C.

500 Marquette Ave. Nw, Suite 700

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorneys

Meena H Allen

Attorney at Allen Law Firm, LLC

6121 Indian School Rd. Ne, Suite 230

Albuquerque, NM 87110

Arthur K. Smith

507 Prestige Circle

Allen, TX 75002

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Allen, Meena) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#7

(#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 1/21/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 12/26/2019. (ccp) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Meena H Allen on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Allen, Meena) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Allen, Meena) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#2

(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Allen, Meena) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit B-4

1 #4

Exhibit B-3

1 #3

Exhibit B-2

1 #2

Exhibit B-1

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2019-02831. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit B-3, #5 Exhibit B-4, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, Meena) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • Docket(#10) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing VACATING Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. The Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque is VACATED. Judge Browning will set a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference at a later date. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docket(#9) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Allen, Meena) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 1/21/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 12/26/2019. (ccp) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#6) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (arp) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketAssociation Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6835854 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allen, Meena) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docket(#5) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. by Meena H Allen on behalf of: Arthur K. Smith Law Offices of Arthur K. Smith 507 Prestige CircleAllen, Texas 75002 469-519-2500 Fax 469-519-2555 asmith@aksmithlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Allen, Meena)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Meena H Allen on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Allen, Meena) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6835806 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allen, Meena) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Allen, Meena) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Allen, Meena) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2019-02831. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit B-3, #5 Exhibit B-4, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, Meena) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less