This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:57:35 (UTC).

Montoya v. Alamosa County Detention Center et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Montoya filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Alamosa County Detention Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gordon P. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00033

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gordon P. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gilberto Andres Montoya

Alamosa, CO 81101

Defendants

Christie Duarte

Alamosa County Detention Center

Turnkey Correction's Inc.

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) STATEMENT re #7 Order on Motion, by Plaintiff Gilberto Andres Montoya. (evana, ) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#1

(#1) Prisoner COMPLAINT against Alamosa County Detention Center, Christie Duarte, Turnkey Correction's Inc., filed by Gilberto Andres Montoya.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER that the Objection, ECF No. #5 , is OVERRUILED. That the January 7, 2020 Order to Cure Deficiencies is revised only to the extent that Plaintiff is not required to provide an address for Mr. Gonzales. That Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this Order to comply with the January 7, 2020 Order to Cure Deficiencies by providing an Inmate History Report from Alamosa County that shows deposits to and balances in Plaintiff's inmate account for the six months immediately preceding the initiation of this action. That if Plaintiff fails to provide his account statement or in the alternative state with specificity when and from whom he requested that a six month inmate account statement be provided to him, but the request was denied, and provide documentation of the requests and denials, the action will be dismissed without further notice for failure to comply with the January 7, 2020 Order to Cure Deficiencies within the time allowed, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/19/2020.(evana, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#2

(#2) Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Gilberto Andres Montoya. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Order to have the Alamosa County Detention Center to produce printed copy to the court of exhaustion of all civil remedies, by Plaintiff Gilberto Andres Montoya. (evana, ) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Order to Remand to District Court Judge by Plaintiff Gilberto Andres Montoya. (evana, ) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty days from the date of this Order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this Order must include the civil action number on this Order. That if Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/7/2020. (evana, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#6

(#6) Letter from Gilberto Montoya (evana, ) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Order to have the Alamosa County Detention Center to produce printed copy to the court of exhaustion of all civil remedies, by Plaintiff Gilberto Andres Montoya. (evana, ) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATEMENT re #7 Order on Motion, by Plaintiff Gilberto Andres Montoya. (evana, ) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER that the Objection, ECF No. #5 , is OVERRUILED. That the January 7, 2020 Order to Cure Deficiencies is revised only to the extent that Plaintiff is not required to provide an address for Mr. Gonzales. That Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this Order to comply with the January 7, 2020 Order to Cure Deficiencies by providing an Inmate History Report from Alamosa County that shows deposits to and balances in Plaintiff's inmate account for the six months immediately preceding the initiation of this action. That if Plaintiff fails to provide his account statement or in the alternative state with specificity when and from whom he requested that a six month inmate account statement be provided to him, but the request was denied, and provide documentation of the requests and denials, the action will be dismissed without further notice for failure to comply with the January 7, 2020 Order to Cure Deficiencies within the time allowed, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/19/2020.(evana, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Gilberto Montoya (evana, ) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Order to Remand to District Court Judge by Plaintiff Gilberto Andres Montoya. (evana, ) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty days from the date of this Order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this Order must include the civil action number on this Order. That if Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/7/2020. (evana, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Gilberto Andres Montoya. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Prisoner COMPLAINT against Alamosa County Detention Center, Christie Duarte, Turnkey Correction's Inc., filed by Gilberto Andres Montoya.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.