This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/09/2022 at 08:41:19 (UTC).

Montgomery v. Wal-Mart, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 Montgomery filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00691

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeanette Montgomery

Defendants

Wal-Mart, Inc.

Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC

Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Sterling Scutt

Attorney at Scutt Law PLLC

1150 N. Loop 1604 W., #108-285

San Antonio, TX 78248

Robert Gene Rodery

Attorney at Thomas J. Henry Law, PLLC

5711 University Heights, Suite 101

San Antonio, TX 78249

Defendant Attorneys

James Kuritzkes

Attorney at Cooper & Scully, P.C.

900 Jackson St, Suite 100

Dallas, TX 75202

Derek Shane Davis

Attorney at Cooper & Scully PC - Dallas

900 Jackson Street, Suite 100

Dallas, TX 75202-4452

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Supplement List of Parties and Counsel State Court Information Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Index of State court Pleadings

#2

(#2) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jeanette Montgomery.(rpc, ) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

#3

(#3) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart, Inc..(rpc, ) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/11/2022. (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/6/2022. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 10/24/2022 at 03:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/1/2022. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#6

(#6) ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Sterling Scutt on behalf of Jeanette Montgomery. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9110063. (Scutt, Matthew) Modified on 9/6/2022 (rpc, ). (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert Gene Rodery on behalf of Jeanette Montgomery. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9110739. (Rodery, Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT Jeanette Montgomery against Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart, Inc., filed by Jeanette Montgomery.(Scutt, Matthew) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

#9

(#9) Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Conference by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC Response to Order Governing Proceedings. (Kuritzkes, James) Modified on 9/21/2022 (rpc, ). (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#10

(#10) Defendant's ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC.(Kuritzkes, James) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendant's ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC.(Kuritzkes, James) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Conference by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC Response to Order Governing Proceedings. (Kuritzkes, James) Modified on 9/21/2022 (rpc, ). (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT Jeanette Montgomery against Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart, Inc., filed by Jeanette Montgomery.(Scutt, Matthew) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert Gene Rodery on behalf of Jeanette Montgomery. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9110739. (Rodery, Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice submitted by Jeanette Montgomery. Each attorney must file their own Notice of Appearance using their login and password when filing. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Sterling Scutt on behalf of Jeanette Montgomery. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9110063. (Scutt, Matthew) Modified on 9/6/2022 (rpc, ). (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/6/2022. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 10/24/2022 at 03:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/1/2022. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/11/2022. (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketNote: Pursuant to Local Rule CV 7(j), any motions pending in another federal or state court made by any party will be considered moot at the time of transfer or removal unless they are re-urged in this court. (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart, Inc..(rpc, ) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jeanette Montgomery.(rpc, ) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketNotified Plaintiff's Attorney, Matthew Scutt, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN OUR COURT ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER SENT VIA EMAIL*** (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC from 429th District Court, Collin County, Texas, case number 429-03071-2022. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9061905), filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement List of Parties and Counsel State Court Information Sheet, #3 Exhibit Index of State court Pleadings)(Davis, Derek) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant