This case was last updated from PACER on 08/03/2020 at 08:41:57 (UTC).

Montgomery et al v. King County et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2020 Montgomery filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against King County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard A. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00855

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jennifer Montgomery

Tom Montgomery

A.C.

Z.C.

Defendants

Hikari Tamura

Jane Doe 2

John Doe 1

Rebecca

Stewart Hanney

Lisa Peterson

Jane Does 3-10

Sueanne Brent

Myron Allen

Benjamin Sanders

Catherine Homer

John Diaz

Danotra McBride

John Does 3-10

King County

Todd Clark

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan David Dreveskracht

Attorney at GALANDA BROADMAN, PLLC

Po Box 15146

Seattle, WA 98115

Gabriel S Galanda

Attorney at GALANDA BROADMAN, PLLC

Po Box 15146

Seattle, WA 98115

Defendant Attorney

John Robert Zeldenrust

King County Prosecuting Attorney'S Office (4Th Ave), 500 4Th Ave, Ste 900

Seattle, WA 98104-5039

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant King County on 7/29/2020 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#23

(#23) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Todd Clark mailed on 6/5/2020 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#22

(#22) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Sueanne Brent mailed on 6/5/2020 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#21

(#21) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Stewart Hanney mailed on 6/5/2020 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#20

(#20) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Michael Kilbourne mailed on 6/5/2020 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#19

(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Lisa Peterson mailed on 6/5/2020 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#18

(#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant John Diaz mailed on 6/5/2020 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#17

(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Hikari Tamura mailed on 6/5/2020 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#16

(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Glen Ocampo mailed on 7/24/2020 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

1 #14

Summons

1 #11

Summons

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#6) DECLARATION of Erik Martin re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Jennifer Montgomery, Tom Montgomery, Michael B Smith (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant King County on 7/29/2020 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Todd Clark mailed on 6/5/2020 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Sueanne Brent mailed on 6/5/2020 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Stewart Hanney mailed on 6/5/2020 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Michael Kilbourne mailed on 6/5/2020 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Lisa Peterson mailed on 6/5/2020 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant John Diaz mailed on 6/5/2020 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Hikari Tamura mailed on 6/5/2020 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Glen Ocampo mailed on 7/24/2020 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Danotra McBride mailed on 6/5/2020 (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Snohomish County (MW) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Snohomish County by Plaintiffs Jennifer Montgomery, Tom Montgomery, Michael B Smith (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael B Smith, Tom Montgomery, Jennifer Montgomery.(Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DECLARATION of Erik Martin re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs Jennifer Montgomery, Tom Montgomery, Michael B Smith (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiffs A.C., Jennifer Montgomery, Tom Montgomery, T.C., Z.C. (Dreveskracht, Ryan) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO FILER re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ST) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Myron Allen, Sueanne Brent, Todd Clark, John Diaz, Stewart Hanney, Catherine Homer, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 1, Michael Kilbourne, King County, Danotra McBride, Lisa Peterson, Benjamin Sanders, Hikari Tamura (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons)(ST) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketJudge Richard A. Jones added. (ST) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6381086), filed by Tom Montgomery, J.C., a minor, A.C., a minor, Jennifer Montgomery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons)(Dreveskracht, Ryan) Modified on 6/5/2020. Jury demand removed as it was not properly indicated on the complaint. (ST) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REBECCA is a litigant

Latest cases where A.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where King County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gabriel S. Galanda