This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/07/2020 at 15:27:32 (UTC).

MONTESANO v. CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 MONTESANO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dabney L. Friedrich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01496

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dabney L. Friedrich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIELLA MONTESANO

Defendants

THE CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA

CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Curtis Aaron Boykin

Attorney at DOUGLAS & BOYKIN PLLC

1850 M Street Nw, Suite 640

Washington, DC 20036

Tram T. Pham

Attorney at DOUGLAS & BOYKIN PLLC

1850 M Street Nw, Suite 640

Washington, DC 20036

Roy T. Willey, IV

Attorney at Anastopoulo Law Firm, LLC

32 Ann St

Charleston, SC 29403

Frederick Arnold Douglas

Attorney at DOUGLAS & BOYKIN PLLC

1850 M Street Nw, Suite 640

Washington, DC 20036

Eric Poulin

Attorney at ANASTOPOULO LAW FIRM

32 Ann Street

Charleston, SC 29403

Defendant Attorney

Bruce M. Berman

Attorney at WILMER CUTLER PICKERING HALE & DORR LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw, 1875 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#15

14 #3

Exhibit C. R. Willey Declaration

14 #2

Exhibit B - E. Poulin Declaration

14 #1

Exhibit A - Anastopoulo Firm Resume

#14

#13

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

#11

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Notice and Consent

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summons

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting the plaintiff's #14 Unopposed Motion to Appoint Counsel as Interim Class Counsel. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 31, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #14 Motion to Appoint Counsel; emailed to tpham@douglasboykin.com, cc'd 13 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. FYI: DO NOT REFILE. For future fillings attorney signature must match login/password. (zeg, ) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Unopposed MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Class Counsel by DANIELLA MONTESANO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Anastopoulo Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit B - E. Poulin Declaration, #3 Exhibit C. R. Willey Declaration)(Pham, Tram) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Tram T. Pham on behalf of DANIELLA MONTESANO (Pham, Tram) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, the defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the #1 Complaint on or before August 17, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 30, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Bruce) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA (Berman, Bruce) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce M. Berman on behalf of CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA (Berman, Bruce) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick Arnold Douglas on behalf of DANIELLA MONTESANO (Douglas, Frederick) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Poulin on behalf of DANIELLA MONTESANO (Poulin, Eric) (Main Document 8 replaced on 6/17/2020) (zeg). (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Roy T. Willey, IV on behalf of DANIELLA MONTESANO (Willey, Roy) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/17/2020) (zeg). (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiff's #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Roy Willey. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 16, 2020. (lcdlf3)(lcmm) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiff's #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Eric Poulin. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). For instructions visit: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/sites/dcd/files/NextGEN_Tutorial_for_Registering_for_E-filing.pdf. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 16, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case randomly reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA served on 6/11/2020, answer due 7/2/2020 (Pham, Tram) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Roy T. Willey, IV, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7211043. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DANIELLA MONTESANO (Boykin, Curtis) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eric M. Poulin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7211005. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DANIELLA MONTESANO (Boykin, Curtis) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmc) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against THE CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7206313) filed by DANIELLA MONTESANO. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boykin, Curtis) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce M. Berman