This case was last updated from PACER on 05/24/2020 at 07:45:24 (UTC).

Montes v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2020 Montes filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Progressive Direct Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C. Nye. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00150

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C. Nye

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Moises Montes

Defendants

Progressive Direct Insurance Company

Does I-V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Kenneth Steen, III

4850 N Rosepoint Way 104

Boise, ID 83713

Bryan Scott Storer

4850 N. Rosepoint Way

Boise, ID 83713

Defendant Attorney

Michael G Brady

Attorney at Eberle Berlin

P.O. Box 1368, Suite 530

Boise, ID 83701

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re #10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. The parties, having filed a Joint Motion and Stipulation, the Court having reviewed the same, and good cause appearing therefor; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint be, and the same is hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own attorney fees and costs. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Michael G Brady appearing for Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company. Responses due by 5/26/2020 (Brady, Michael)

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. Replies due by 5/6/2020.(Brady, Michael)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT in Support by Bryan S Storer re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Confirming Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Moises Montes.(Storer, Bryan)

7 #2

Affidavit

7 #1

Memorandum in Support

#7

(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court Bryan Scott Storer appearing for Plaintiff Moises Montes. Responses due by 5/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit)(Storer, Bryan)

#6

(#6) Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Progressive Direct Insurance Company.(Brady, Michael)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Moises Montes and Progressive Direct Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 5/26/2020. (ckh)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Direct Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Direct Insurance Company.. (Brady, Michael)

3 #3

Supplement State Court Docket Sheet

3 #2

Supplement Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial

3 #1

Supplement Service of Summons

1 #4

Declaration of Richard H. Greener

1 #3

Declaration of Jeffrey M. May

1 #2

Declaration of Michael G. Brady

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Direct Insurance Company from Ada County District, case number CV01-20-03712.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-2029964.), filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Michael G. Brady, #3 Declaration of Jeffrey M. May, #4 Declaration of Richard H. Greener)(Brady, Michael)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re #10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. The parties, having filed a Joint Motion and Stipulation, the Court having reviewed the same, and good cause appearing therefor; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint be, and the same is hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own attorney fees and costs. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Michael G Brady appearing for Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company. Responses due by 5/26/2020 (Brady, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. Replies due by 5/6/2020.(Brady, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT in Support by Bryan S Storer re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Confirming Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Moises Montes.(Storer, Bryan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court Bryan Scott Storer appearing for Plaintiff Moises Montes. Responses due by 5/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit)(Storer, Bryan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Progressive Direct Insurance Company.(Brady, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Moises Montes and Progressive Direct Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 5/26/2020. (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Progressive Direct Insurance Company served on 3/25/2020. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Direct Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation for Progressive Direct Insurance Company.. (Brady, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ada County District, case number CV01-20-03712.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-2030365.) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Service of Summons, #2 Supplement Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Supplement State Court Docket Sheet)(Brady, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Unless the Plaintiff contacts my Judicial Assistant, Amy Beers, and requests a different date and time, the Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on June 1, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. mountain time, (Boise chambers) for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. Plaintiff must initiate the conference call by placing it to (208) 334-9022 and must have all appropriate parties on the line. On or before May 26, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company was filed incorrectly in this case. All state court documents should be individual attachments to the Notice of Removal without declarations. The filing party shall please re-submit the state court docket sheet, complaint and service documents using the Supplement event and linking it to the #1 Notice of Removal with each document separately attached and named to reflect the nature of the document attached. (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Direct Insurance Company from Ada County District, case number CV01-20-03712.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-2029964.), filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Michael G. Brady, #3 Declaration of Jeffrey M. May, #4 Declaration of Richard H. Greener)(Brady, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less