This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/17/2022 at 06:34:45 (UTC).

Monteiro v. Jeff Wyler Columbus, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 Monteiro filed an Other lawsuit against Jeff Wyler Columbus, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Algenon L. Marbley and Chelsey M. Vascura. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00625

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Algenon L. Marbley

Referral Judge

Chelsey M. Vascura

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Monteiro

Defendants

JP Morgan Chase Bank, N,A.

Jeff Wyler Columbus, Inc.

Santander Consumer USA, Inc.

U.S. Bank National Assocation

AmeriCredit Financial Services

Citizens Financial Group, Inc.

Ally Bank

Global Lending Services LLC

Capital One Auto Finance Inc

Park National Corporation

Fifth Third Bancorp

Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company

Citizens Financial Group, Inc. doing business as Citizens Bank

Santander Consumer USA, Inc. doing business as Chrysler Corporation

Park National Corporation Southwest Ohio and Northern Kentucky doing business as Park National Bank

AmeriCredit Financial Services doing business as GM Financial

Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company doing business as M&T Bank

Jeff Wyler Columbus, Inc. doing business as Jeff Wyler Chevrolet, Inc.

Fifth Third Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc E Dann

Attorney at Dann Law Firm

15000 Madison Avenue

Lakewood, OH 44107

Brian Flick

Attorney at DannLaw

15000 Madison Avenue

Cuyahoga, OH 44107

Defendant Attorneys

David J. Dirisamer

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

41 South High St., Suite 3300

Columbus, OH 43215

Mitchell Lawrence Guc

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

4000 Town Center, Suite 1800

Southfield, MI 48075-1505

Michael J Chapman

Attorney at Rendigs, Fry, Kiely & Dennis LLP

600 Vine Street, Suite 2650

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Ethan G. Ostroff

Attorney at Troutman Sanders, LLP.

222 Central Park Ave., Suite 2000

Virginia Beach, VA 23462

Jonathan P Saxton

Attorney at Rendigs Fry Kiely & Dennis - 1

600 Vine Street, Suite 2650

Cincinnati, OH 45202-3688

Austin D Padgett

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP

600 Peachtree St. Ne, Suite 5200

Atlanta, GA 30308

Wesley Abrams

Attorney at Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease, LLP

301 E. Fourth Street, Suite 3500

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Laura A Hauser

Attorney at Hauser Law LLC

3391 Bradford Road

Cleveland Heights, OH 44118

Kara Ann Czanik

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP

255 E. Fifth Street, Suite 1900

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Jessica M. Johnson

3401 Tuttle Road, Suite 200

Cleveland, OH 44122

Stefanie L Deka

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford

3401 Tuttle Road, Ste 200

Cleveland, OH 44122

Christopher A. LaRocco

52 East Gay Street, P.O. Box 1008

Columbus, OH 43216-1008

James W Sandy

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford

3401 Tuttle Road, Suite 200

Cleveland, OH 44122

 

Court Documents

#91

(#91) STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Jose Monteiro. (Flick, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#89

(#89) STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Jose Monteiro. (Flick, Brian) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#87

(#87) STATUS REPORT Joint by Plaintiff Jose Monteiro. (Flick, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#85

(#85) STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Jose Monteiro. (Flick, Brian) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#84

(#84) NOTICE by Defendant U.S. Bank National Assocation of Trial Counsel Withdrawal and Substitution (Guc, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

1 #17

Summons Form Summons - Santander

1 #14

Summons Form Summons - Chase

1 #13

Summons Form Summons - Global

1 #12

Summons Form Summons - Fifth Third

1 #11

Summons Form Summons - Citizens

1 #10

Summons Form Summons - Cap One

1 #9

Summons Form Summons - Americredit

1 #8

Summons Form Summons - Ally

1 #7

Summons Form Summons - Wyler

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Other Credit Denials

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - GM Financial

#1

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) NOTATION ORDER granting #91 Request for Extension of Time. Status Report or Dismissal Entry due by 6/24/2022. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/25/2022. (agm) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Jose Monteiro. (Flick, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) NOTATION ORDER granting #89 request for extension of time. Status Report or dismissal entry due by 4/22/2022. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/14/2022. (agm) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Jose Monteiro. (Flick, Brian) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) NOTATION ORDER granting #87 Motion for Extension of Time to file status report or dismissal entry. Status Report due by 3/11/2022. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 2/8/2022. (agm) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) STATUS REPORT Joint by Plaintiff Jose Monteiro. (Flick, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Docket(#86) NOTATION ORDER - Parties are DIRECTED to file a joint written REPORT detailing the status of this case ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 4, 2022, unless they have filed a dismissal entry in accordance with Federal Civil Rule 41(a)(1)(A) in the interim. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/4/2022. (agm) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Jose Monteiro. (Flick, Brian) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) NOTICE by Defendant U.S. Bank National Assocation of Trial Counsel Withdrawal and Substitution (Guc, Mitchell) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/3/2022. (agm) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Capital One Auto Finance Inc. Capital One Auto Finance Inc served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Flick, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Citizens Financial Group, Inc.. Citizens Financial Group, Inc. served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Flick, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Fifth Third Bancorp. Fifth Third Bancorp served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Flick, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Global Lending Services LLC. Global Lending Services LLC served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Flick, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company. Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Flick, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant U.S. Bank National Assocation. U.S. Bank National Assocation served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Flick, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Park National Corporation. Park National Corporation served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Flick, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Santander Consumer USA, Inc.. Santander Consumer USA, Inc. served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Flick, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Ally Bank, AmeriCredit Financial Services, Capital One Auto Finance Inc, Citizens Financial Group, Inc., Fifth Third Bancorp, Global Lending Services LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N,A., Jeff Wyler Columbus, Inc., Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company, Park National Corporation, Santander Consumer USA, Inc., U.S. Bank National Assocation. (jlk) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8113126), filed by Jose Monteiro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - RISC, #2 Exhibit 2 - Suburban Title, #3 Exhibit 3 - Credit Pulls, #4 Exhibit 4 - GM Financial, #5 Exhibit 5 - Other Credit Denials, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Form Summons - Wyler, #8 Summons Form Summons - Ally, #9 Summons Form Summons - Americredit, #10 Summons Form Summons - Cap One, #11 Summons Form Summons - Citizens, #12 Summons Form Summons - Fifth Third, #13 Summons Form Summons - Global, #14 Summons Form Summons - Chase, #15 Summons Form Summons - M&T, #16 Summons Form Summons - Park Natl, #17 Summons Form Summons - Santander, #18 Summons Form Summons - US Bank) (Flick, Brian) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Santander Consumer USA, Inc. doing business as Chrysler Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Global Lending Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Park National Corporation is a litigant