Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/27/2021 at 11:22:21 (UTC).

Monteiro v. Cormier et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 Monteiro filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Cormier. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mary S. McElroy and Lincoln D. Almond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00046

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary S. McElroy

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joao Monteiro

Defendants

City of Pawtucket

Trevor Lefebvre

Daniel Mullen

Tina Goncalves

Susan Cormier

Tamara Wong

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William V. Devine, Jr.

Attorney at D'Amico Burchfield, LLP

536 Atwells Avenue

Providence, RI 02909

Mark Loevy-Reyes

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 N. Aberdeen St., 3Rd Floor

Chicago, IL 60607

Megan Pierce

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 N. Aberdeen St., 3Rd Floor

Chicago, IL 60607

Tara Thompson

Attorney at Loevy & Loevy

311 N. Aberdeen St., 3Rd Floor

Chicago, IL 60607

Defendant Attorneys

Marc DeSisto

Attorney at DeSisto Law LLC

60 Ship Street, 272-4442, Fax: 272-9937

Providence, RI 02903

Ryan D. Stys

Attorney at DeSisto Law, LLC

60 Ship Street

Providence, RI 02910

Caroline V. Murphy

Attorney at DeSisto Law

60 Ship Street

Providence, RI 02903

Michael W. Field

Attorney at Department of Attorney General

150 South Main Street - Civil Division, 274-4400, Ext. 2380, Fax: 222-2995

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint by Tamara Wong.(Field, Michael) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Field on behalf of Tamara Wong (Field, Michael) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Complaint by City of Pawtucket, Susan Cormier, Tina Goncalves, Trevor Lefebvre, Daniel Mullen.(DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline V. Murphy on behalf of City of Pawtucket, Susan Cormier, Tina Goncalves, Trevor Lefebvre, Daniel Mullen (Murphy, Caroline) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan D. Stys on behalf of City of Pawtucket, Susan Cormier, Tina Goncalves, Trevor Lefebvre, Daniel Mullen (Stys, Ryan) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Marc DeSisto on behalf of City of Pawtucket, Susan Cormier, Tina Goncalves, Trevor Lefebvre, Daniel Mullen (DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joao Monteiro. Tamara Wong served on 1/28/2021, answer due 2/18/2021. (Devine, William) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joao Monteiro. City of Pawtucket served on 1/28/2021, answer due 2/18/2021. (Devine, William) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joao Monteiro. Tina Goncalves served on 1/28/2021, answer due 2/18/2021. (Devine, William) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#2

(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

1 #7

TW Summons

1 #6

COP Summons

1 #5

TG Summons

1 #4

DM Summons

1 #3

TL Summons

1 #2

SC Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1587478 ), filed by Joao Monteiro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 SC Summons, #3 TL Summons, #4 DM Summons, #5 TG Summons, #6 COP Summons, #7 TW Summons)(Devine, William) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Complaint by Tamara Wong.(Field, Michael) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Field on behalf of Tamara Wong (Field, Michael) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Complaint by City of Pawtucket, Susan Cormier, Tina Goncalves, Trevor Lefebvre, Daniel Mullen.(DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline V. Murphy on behalf of City of Pawtucket, Susan Cormier, Tina Goncalves, Trevor Lefebvre, Daniel Mullen (Murphy, Caroline) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan D. Stys on behalf of City of Pawtucket, Susan Cormier, Tina Goncalves, Trevor Lefebvre, Daniel Mullen (Stys, Ryan) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Marc DeSisto on behalf of City of Pawtucket, Susan Cormier, Tina Goncalves, Trevor Lefebvre, Daniel Mullen (DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joao Monteiro. Tamara Wong served on 1/28/2021, answer due 2/18/2021. (Devine, William) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joao Monteiro. City of Pawtucket served on 1/28/2021, answer due 2/18/2021. (Devine, William) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joao Monteiro. Tina Goncalves served on 1/28/2021, answer due 2/18/2021. (Devine, William) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joao Monteiro. Daniel Mullen served on 1/28/2021, answer due 2/18/2021. (Devine, William) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Mark Loevy-Reyes to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1589314 ) filed by Joao Monteiro. (Devine, William) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by William V. Devine, Jr. on behalf of Joao Monteiro (Devine, William) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1587478 ), filed by Joao Monteiro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 SC Summons, #3 TL Summons, #4 DM Summons, #5 TG Summons, #6 COP Summons, #7 TW Summons)(Devine, William) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1587478 ), filed by Joao Monteiro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 SC Summons, #3 TL Summons, #4 DM Summons, #5 TG Summons, #6 COP Summons, #7 TW Summons)(Devine, William) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan D. Stys

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caroline V. Murphy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc DeSisto

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael W. Field