This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:11:30 (UTC).

MONTE v. 7-ELEVEN, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Labor - Labor Standard case was filed by MONTE against 7-ELEVEN, INC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-17083

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Ann Marie Donio

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEVIN MONTE

Defendant

7-ELEVEN, INC.

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD H. BAUCH on behalf of 7-ELEVEN, INC. (BAUCH, RICHARD) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7-ELEVEN, INC. identifying SEJ Asset Management & Investment Company as Corporate Parent.. (BAUCH, RICHARD) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY STEVEN SEILER on behalf of KEVIN MONTE (SEILER, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW R. OLCESE on behalf of KEVIN MONTE (OLCESE, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to 7-ELEVEN, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 7-ELEVEN, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9913381) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KEVIN MONTE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #2

Summons

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 7-ELEVEN, INC.. 7-ELEVEN, INC. waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (BAUCH, RICHARD) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7-ELEVEN, INC. identifying SEJ Asset Management & Investment Company as Corporate Parent.. (BAUCH, RICHARD) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 7-ELEVEN, INC.. 7-ELEVEN, INC. waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (BAUCH, RICHARD) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD H. BAUCH on behalf of 7-ELEVEN, INC. (BAUCH, RICHARD) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW R. OLCESE on behalf of KEVIN MONTE (OLCESE, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY STEVEN SEILER on behalf of KEVIN MONTE (SEILER, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to 7-ELEVEN, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against 7-ELEVEN, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9913381) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KEVIN MONTE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.