This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 08:21:43 (UTC).

Monroe v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Monroe filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire Casualty Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01982

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Debra Monroe

Defendant

State Farm Fire & Casualty Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Lee Hoffoss, Jr

Attorney at Hoffoss Devall

517 W College St

Lake Charles, LA 70605

Matthew Baer McGlathery

Attorney at McGlathery Law

517 W College St

Lake Charels, LA 70605

Defendant Attorneys

Gordon Page Guthrie, III

Attorney at Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (NO)

704 Carondelet St

New Orleans, LA 70130

Charles L Chassaignac, IV

Attorney at Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (BR)

301 St Charles St

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Eleanor Weeks Wall

Attorney at Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (BR)

301 St Charles St

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Emily S Morrison

Attorney at Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (BR)

301 St Charles St

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Guthrie, Gordon) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (aty,Guthrie, Gordon) Modified docket text on 7/26/2021 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 07/26/2021)

6 #1

Exhibit Notice of Service

#6

(#6) NOTICE of List of Parties by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Service)(aty,Guthrie, Gordon) Modified docket text on 7/26/2021 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 07/26/2021)

5 #2

Exhibit A

5 #1

Order

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer #1 Complaint with consent by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Attorney Gordon Page Guthrie, III added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Co(pty:dft))(aty,Guthrie, Gordon) Modified on 7/26/2021 to capture more accurate motion event, create docket entry relationship and modify docket text (Miletello, A). (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Debra Monroe. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (aty,Hoffoss, John) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

2 #2

Exhibit B

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire & Casualty Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4732995) filed by Debra Monroe. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney John Lee Hoffoss, Jr added to party Debra Monroe(pty:pla))(aty,Hoffoss, John) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Guthrie, Gordon) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co answer due 8/26/2021. Signed by Judge James D. Cain, Jr. on 7/27/2021. (crt,Fontenot, S) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (aty,Guthrie, Gordon) Modified docket text on 7/26/2021 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of List of Parties by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Service)(aty,Guthrie, Gordon) Modified docket text on 7/26/2021 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer #1 Complaint with consent by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Attorney Gordon Page Guthrie, III added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Co(pty:dft))(aty,Guthrie, Gordon) Modified on 7/26/2021 to capture more accurate motion event, create docket entry relationship and modify docket text (Miletello, A). (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Debra Monroe. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (aty,Hoffoss, John) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to State Farm Fire & Casualty Co, requested by Debra Monroe. (aty,Hoffoss, John) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire & Casualty Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4732995) filed by Debra Monroe. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney John Lee Hoffoss, Jr added to party Debra Monroe(pty:pla))(aty,Hoffoss, John) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant