Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2020 at 08:33:57 (UTC).

Monroe v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 Monroe filed an Other lawsuit against Caliber Home Loans, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas J. McAvoy and Miroslav Lovric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00217

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas J. McAvoy

Referral Judge

Miroslav Lovric

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David A. Monroe

Defendant

Caliber Home Loans, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Javier Luis Merino

Attorney at The Dann Law Firm

372 Kinderkamack Road, Suite 5

Westwood, NJ 07675

Defendant Attorneys

Alfred W.J. Marks

Attorney at Day, Pitney Law Firm - New York Office

7 Times Square, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Gregory Bruno

Attorney at Day Pitney LLP

605 Third Avenue, 31St Fl.

New York, NY 10158

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Letter from Gregory Bruno regarding admission requirement. (dpk) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Bruno on behalf of Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Bruno, Gregory) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Caliber Home Loanes, Inc.; Attorney Gregory R. Bruno, Email address is gbruno@daypitney.com. Phone number is (212) 297-2445. Admissions due by 4/3/2020. {Emailed to attorney on 3/20/2020}(see) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#6

(#6) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LSF6 Service Operations, LLC for Caliber Home Loans, Inc... (Marks, Alfred) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Alfred W.J. Marks on behalf of Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Marks, Alfred) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. submitted to Judge Thomas J. McAvoy. (Marks, Alfred) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (dpk) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#2

(#2) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 5/27/2020 at 2:30 PM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Judge Lovric only conducts Rule 16 Initial Conferences IN PERSON in Binghamton, New York in all cases with no exceptions. Any request to appear by telephone at the Rule 16 initial conference will be DENIED. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/20/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

1 #15

Exhibit 15

1 #14

Exhibit 14

1 #13

Exhibit 13

1 #10

Exhibit 10

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5042821) filed by David A. Monroe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter from Gregory Bruno regarding admission requirement. (dpk) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Bruno on behalf of Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Bruno, Gregory) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER: Granting #4 Stipulation. Answer is now due for Caliber Home Loans, Inc. by 4/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 3/20/2020. (jdp ) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Caliber Home Loanes, Inc.; Attorney Gregory R. Bruno, Email address is gbruno@daypitney.com. Phone number is (212) 297-2445. Admissions due by 4/3/2020. {Emailed to attorney on 3/20/2020}(see) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LSF6 Service Operations, LLC for Caliber Home Loans, Inc... (Marks, Alfred) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Alfred W.J. Marks on behalf of Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Marks, Alfred) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. submitted to Judge Thomas J. McAvoy. (Marks, Alfred) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (dpk) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 5/27/2020 at 2:30 PM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Judge Lovric only conducts Rule 16 Initial Conferences IN PERSON in Binghamton, New York in all cases with no exceptions. Any request to appear by telephone at the Rule 16 initial conference will be DENIED. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/20/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5042821) filed by David A. Monroe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Caliber Home Loans, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alfred W.J. Marks